ZAGKLARA v. SPRAGUE ENERGY CORP

Plaintiff: EIRINI ZAGKLARA
Defendant: SPRAGUE ENERGY CORP
 
Case Number: 2:2010cv00445
Filed: October 29, 2010
 
Court: Maine District Court
Office: Portland Office
County: Cumberland
Referring Judge: JOHN H. RICH
Presiding Judge: JOHN A. WOODCOCK
 
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 24, 2012 108 Featured Case ORDER AFFIRMING THE RECOMMENDED DECISION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE denying 70 Motion for Summary Judgment; adopting Report and Recommended Decision re 97 Report and Recommendations. By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (lrc)
October 10, 2012 123 Featured Case REPORT OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND ORDER By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (lrc)
January 7, 2013 150 Featured Case ORDER ON MOTION TO BIFURCATE re 129 Motion to Bifurcate By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (lrc)
January 15, 2013 151 Featured Case ORDER ON MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF PAUL ZORIC re: denying without prejudice- 116 Motion Exclude Testimony of Plaintiff's Expert By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (mjlt)
January 15, 2013 152 Featured Case ORDER ON MOTION IN LIMINE re: granting in part and denying in part 125 Motion in Limine By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (mjlt)
January 22, 2013 153 Featured Case ORDER ON MOTION FOR APPLICATION OF GENERAL MARITIME LAW granting 130 Motion for Application of General Maritime Law By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (lrc)
February 4, 2013 158 Featured Case ORDER ON MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION denying 155 Motion for Reconsideration By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (lrc)
April 5, 2013 206 Featured Case PROCEDURAL ORDER REGARDING COURTROOM PROTOCOL By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (mjlt)
April 9, 2013 222 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING THE DEPOSITON DESIGNATIONS OF CAPTAIN SOLENKOV re 209 Response to Objections of Capt. G. Solenkov, 212 Deposition Designation & Objections to Capt. Solenkov, 217 Response to Objections to Designations of Capt. Solenkov Deposition By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (lrc)
May 26, 2011 26 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION ON MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (dfr)
June 22, 2011 38 Featured Case ORDER ON MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION - By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (mnw)
August 23, 2011 55 Featured Case ORDER AFFIRMING THE RECOMMENDED DECISION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (lrc)
September 16, 2011 62 Featured Case ORDER & REPORT OF CONFERENCE- Stipulated Record due by 10/14/2011, Summary Judgment Motion due by 10/17/2011, Ready for Trial on 2/6/2012. By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (lrc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: ZAGKLARA v. SPRAGUE ENERGY CORP
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EIRINI ZAGKLARA
Represented By: DAVID F. ANDERSON
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPRAGUE ENERGY CORP
Represented By: MICHAEL X. SAVASUK
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]