ANGELA ADAMS LICENSING LLC et al v. WALMART STORES INC et al

Defendant: WALMART.COM INC, HOMESTEAD INTERNATIONAL GROUP LTD and WALMART STORES INC
Plaintiff: ANGELA ADAMS LICENSING LLC and ANGELA ADAMS DESIGNS LLC
Case Number: 2:2011cv00005
Filed: January 6, 2011
Court: Maine District Court
Office: Portland Office
County: Cumberland
Referring Judge: JOHN H. RICH
Presiding Judge: GEORGE Z. SINGAL
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 18, 2012 120 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTIONS TO AMEND ANSWER AND TO MODIFY SCHEDULING ORDER granting 97 Motion to Amend, granting in part 100 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (lrc)
July 24, 2012 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER & REPORT OF CONFERENCE By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (lrc)
February 5, 2013 183 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AFFIRMING THE RECOMMENDED DECISION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE denying 133 Motion for Summary Judgment; adopting Report and Recommended Decision re 179 Report and Recommendations. By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (lrc)
November 3, 2011 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AFFIRMING THE RECOMMENDED DECISION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE denying 24 Motion to Dismiss ; adopting Report and Recommended Decision re 64 Report and Recommendations. By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (lrc)
February 28, 2012 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTION TO AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER granting 83 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (nrg)
March 7, 2012 96 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER ON MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (nrg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ANGELA ADAMS LICENSING LLC et al v. WALMART STORES INC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALMART.COM INC
Represented By: LAURA L. CHAPMAN
Represented By: COURTNEY WORCESTER
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOMESTEAD INTERNATIONAL GROUP LTD
Represented By: ALISON G. CARLSON
Represented By: JAMES G. GOGGIN
Represented By: JAMES PATRICK JEFFRY
Represented By: LORA A. MOFFATT
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALMART STORES INC
Represented By: COURTNEY WORCESTER
Represented By: LAURA L. CHAPMAN
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGELA ADAMS LICENSING LLC
Represented By: MARGARET MINISTER O'KEEFE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGELA ADAMS DESIGNS LLC
Represented By: MARGARET MINISTER O'KEEFE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]