ROBINSON v. MILLER et al

Plaintiff: DAVID J ROBINSON
Defendant: JO MILLER and HERBERT A MILLER
 
Case Number: 2:2011cv00056
Filed: February 11, 2011
 
Court: Maine District Court
Office: Portland Office
County: Cumberland
Referring Judge: JOHN H. RICH
Presiding Judge: GEORGE Z. SINGAL
 
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 31, 2012 132 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION ON MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF PARTIES denying 93 Motion to Substitute Party; denying 93 Motion to Extend Time By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (nrg)
June 30, 2011 33 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS - granting 7 Motion to Dismiss. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (mnw)
July 7, 2011 34 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION ON MOTION UNDER RULE 35 denying 27 MOTION Pursuant to F.R. Civ. P. 35 for Order Directing Defendant Herbert A. Miller to Submit to Physical and Mental Examination By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (dfr)
October 28, 2011 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION denying 87 Motion to Strike, granting 87 Motion to Extend Time for response, and granting 87 Motion for Leave to File in excess of page limit By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (nrg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: ROBINSON v. MILLER et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID J ROBINSON
Represented By: THIMI R. MINA
Represented By: SHAUN GARRY
Represented By: DAVID S. BISCHOFF
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JO MILLER
Represented By: KATHRYN W. MCGINTEE
Represented By: JOHN M.R. PATERSON
Represented By: MATTHEW TARASEVICH
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HERBERT A MILLER
Represented By: KATHRYN W. MCGINTEE
Represented By: JOHN M.R. PATERSON
Represented By: MATTHEW TARASEVICH
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]