LYNCH v. CHRISTIE et al

Defendant: POSITIVE DESIGN INC, STEVEN SCHWARTZ and JOAN L CHRISTIE
Plaintiff: ROBERT P LYNCH
Case Number: 2:2011cv00070
Filed: February 24, 2011
Court: Maine District Court
Office: Portland Office
County: Cumberland
Presiding Judge: D. BROCK HORNBY
Referring Judge: JOHN H. RICH
Nature of Suit: Assault, Libel, and Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 12, 2011 40 Opinion or Order of the Court PROCEDURAL ORDER - By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (mnw)
September 7, 2011 43 Opinion or Order of the Court DECISION AND ORDER ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT - denying 29 Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint of the Plaintiff, Robert P. Lynch, Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(B)(6) ; denying 31 Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint of the Plaintiff, Robert P. Lynch, Pursuant to 14 M.R.S.A. sec. 556 - By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (mnw)
November 18, 2011 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 47 Motion to Stay By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (jgw)
June 21, 2012 73 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ATTACHMENT - granting in part 55 Motion for Attachment & Trustee Process. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (mnw)
August 13, 2012 81 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT OF PRE-FILING CONFERENCE UNDER LOCAL RULE 56 - By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (mnw)
November 20, 2012 93 Opinion or Order of the Court DECISION AND ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT - denying 86 Motion for Summary Judgment. By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (mnw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LYNCH v. CHRISTIE et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: POSITIVE DESIGN INC
Represented By: JUSTIN W. ANDRUS
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVEN SCHWARTZ
Represented By: JUSTIN W. ANDRUS
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOAN L CHRISTIE
Represented By: LEE H. BALS
Represented By: ANDREA S. BATCHELDER
Represented By: MICHAEL W. GALLAGHER
Represented By: PAUL SCHOR
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT P LYNCH
Represented By: ADAM J. SHUB
Represented By: DANIEL RAPAPORT
Represented By: HOLLY RUSSELL JONES
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]