SPRAGUE CHADBROWN v. COLES

Plaintiff: TERAH SPRAGUE CHADBROWN
Defendant: JAMES REED COLES
 
Case Number: 2:2011cv00145
Filed: April 8, 2011
 
Court: Maine District Court
Office: Portland Office
County: Cumberland
Referring Judge: MARGARET J. KRAVCHUK
Presiding Judge: GEORGE Z. SINGAL
 
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 15, 2011 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 26 Motion for Recusal. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARGARET J. KRAVCHUK. (CWP)
October 14, 2011 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTION TO ASSIGN A FAIR JUDGE re 43 Motion to Assign a Fair Judge By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (lrc)
December 13, 2011 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AFFIRMING THE RECOMMENDED DECISION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE adopting Report and Recommended Decision re 63 Report and Recommendations re 16 Motion to Dismiss By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (lrc)
December 4, 2012 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AFFIRMING THE RECOMMENDED DECISION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE denying 89 Motion for Attorney Fees; adopting Report and Recommended Decision re 92 Report and Recommendations. By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (MSH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: SPRAGUE CHADBROWN v. COLES
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERAH SPRAGUE CHADBROWN
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES REED COLES
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]