NOVELETSKY et al v. METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY INC et al

Defendant: FRANCINE TEMKIN, ALAN L SILVERMAN and METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY INC
Plaintiff: HOLLIE T NOVELETSKY, THOMAS HEANEY and JOSHUA W ROSENTHAL
Case Number: 2:2012cv00021
Filed: January 20, 2012
Court: Maine District Court
Office: Portland Office
County: York
Referring Judge: JOHN H. RICH
Presiding Judge: NANCY TORRESEN
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 14, 2013 148 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING IN PART THE MAGISTRATES RECOMMENDED DECISION re: 95 Motion for Summary Judgment; re 137 Report and Recommendations. By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (dfr)
October 10, 2013 158 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT OF CONFERENCE OF COUNSEL AND SCHEDULING ORDER By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (dfr)
December 4, 2013 173 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 162 Motion to Substitute Expert Witness ; granting 168 Motion to Extend Time to file Daubert Motions on Plaintiffs' Damages Expert By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (dfr)
September 24, 2014 230 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON PARTIES CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT granting in part 174 Motion to Exclude; granting 175 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 176 Motion in Limine ; granting 178 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part 180 Motion in Limine ; granting 182 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part 183 Motion in Limine ; denying 191 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part 220 Motion to Exclude; granting in part 221 Motion to Exclude; granting in part 222 Motion to Exclude By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (dfr)
September 27, 2012 88 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDERON DISCOVERY DISPUTES re: 66 Motion and 71 Objection By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (dfr)
September 27, 2012 89 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDERON DISCOVERY DISPUTE By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (dfr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NOVELETSKY et al v. METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY INC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRANCINE TEMKIN
Represented By: PHILLIP S. BIXBY
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALAN L SILVERMAN
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY INC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOLLIE T NOVELETSKY
Represented By: SIGMUND D. SCHUTZ
Represented By: BENJAMIN S. PIPER
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS HEANEY
Represented By: SIGMUND D. SCHUTZ
Represented By: BENJAMIN S. PIPER
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSHUA W ROSENTHAL
Represented By: BENJAMIN S. PIPER
Represented By: SIGMUND D. SCHUTZ
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]