165 PARK ROW INC v. JHR DEVELOPMENT LLC

Defendant: MAINE AND NOBLE LLC and JHR DEVELOPMENT LLC
Plaintiff: 165 PARK ROW INC
Case Number: 2:2012cv00106
Filed: March 29, 2012
Court: Maine District Court
Office: Portland Office
County: Cumberland
Referring Judge: JOHN H. RICH
Presiding Judge: NANCY TORRESEN
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1121
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 25, 2013 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANTS CROSS MOTIONS IN LIMINE REGARDING CONFUSION LOG EVIDENCE reserving ruling 69 Motion in Limine ; reserving ruling 77 Motion in Limine By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (dfr)
December 6, 2013 124 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON THE DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF SECONDARY MEANING FROM AFTER JUNE 28, 2011 re:denying 70 Motion in Limine By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (mjlt)
February 4, 2014 151 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT NOTWITHSTANDING THE VERDICT denying 148 Motion for Judgment NOV By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (dfr)
February 4, 2014 152 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (dfr)
February 20, 2013 51 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION ON MOTION TO EXCLUDE granting in part and denying in part 41 Motion to Exclude By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (dfr)
August 26, 2013 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AFFIRMING THE RECOMMENDED DECISION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE re 55 Report and Recommendations. denying 26 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 27 Motion for Summary Judgment; By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (dfr)
October 28, 2013 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFFS PROPOSED TRIAL DEPOSITIONS By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (dfr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 165 PARK ROW INC v. JHR DEVELOPMENT LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAINE AND NOBLE LLC
Represented By: JOHN F. BARNICLE, JR.
Represented By: FRANK N. GAETA
Represented By: DAVID GLOD
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JHR DEVELOPMENT LLC
Represented By: JOHN F. BARNICLE, JR.
Represented By: FRANK N. GAETA
Represented By: DAVID GLOD
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 165 PARK ROW INC
Represented By: JAMES G. GOGGIN
Represented By: ADRIANNE E. FOUTS
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]