JENSEN BAIRD GARDNER AND HENRY v. WIRTH et al

Plaintiff: JENSEN BAIRD GARDNER AND HENRY
Defendant: JERZY WIRTH, STEPHEN B WADE, ESQ and SKELTON TAINTOR AND ABBOTT
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv00296
Filed: September 27, 2012
 
Court: Maine District Court
Office: Portland Office
County: XX Outside the State
Referring Judge: JOHN H. RICH
Presiding Judge: JOHN A. WOODCOCK
 
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1335 Interpleader Action
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 13, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 22 Motion to Extend Time for Depositing Funds with the Court. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (jlg)
April 11, 2013 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 46 Motion to be Permitted to Participate in All Upcoming Conferences by Telephone. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
May 8, 2013 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing without prejudice 43 Motion to Unseal Document. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
May 15, 2013 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 52 Motion to Discharge Jensen Baird Gardner & Henry as Stakeholder. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
October 28, 2013 88 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (nrg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: JENSEN BAIRD GARDNER AND HENRY v. WIRTH et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENSEN BAIRD GARDNER AND HENRY
Represented By: MICHAEL A. NELSON
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JERZY WIRTH
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEPHEN B WADE, ESQ
Represented By: JAMES E. BELLEAU
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SKELTON TAINTOR AND ABBOTT
Represented By: JAMES E. BELLEAU
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]