LYMAN MORSE BOATBUILDING INC et al v. NORTHERN ASSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA

Plaintiff: LYMAN MORSE BOATBUILDING INC and CABOT LYMAN
Defendant: NORTHERN ASSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv00313
Filed: October 16, 2012
 
Court: Maine District Court
Office: Portland Office
County: Knox
Presiding Judge: D. BROCK HORNBY
Referring Judge: JOHN H. RICH
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 15, 2013 15 Featured Case REPORT OF PRE-FILING CONFERENCE UNDER RULE 56 - By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (mnw)
September 10, 2013 32 Featured Case PROCEDURAL ORDER ON MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND JUDGMENT ON A STIPULATED RECORD - Set Deadlines: Defendant's Memo due by 9/17/2013. Plaintiffs' Memo due by 9/20/2013. By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (mnw)
September 27, 2013 35 Featured Case DECISION AND ORDER ON CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re 17 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; 17 Motion for Summary Judgment; 21 Motion for Summary Judgment. By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (mnw)
March 6, 2014 60 Featured Case DECISION AND ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS MOTIONFOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DAMAGES re: 41 Motion for Summary Judgment on Damages By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (dfr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: LYMAN MORSE BOATBUILDING INC et al v. NORTHERN ASSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LYMAN MORSE BOATBUILDING INC
Represented By: LEONARD W. LANGER
Represented By: ROBERT C. HATCH
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CABOT LYMAN
Represented By: LEONARD W. LANGER
Represented By: ROBERT C. HATCH
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTHERN ASSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
Represented By: JAMES D. POLIQUIN
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]