HOOKER v. USA et al

Plaintiff: SAMUEL HOOKER
Defendant: USA and FEDERAL MARSHALS SERVICE
Case Number: 2:2012cv00346
Filed: November 14, 2012
Court: Maine District Court
Office: Portland Office
County: Cumberland
Referring Judge: MARGARET J. KRAVCHUK
Presiding Judge: NANCY TORRESEN
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 9, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 27 Motion to Amend. ; denying as moot 18 Motion to Dismiss. By JUDGE JOSEPH N LAPLANTE. (dfr)
January 13, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 34 Motion to Dismiss; adopting Report and Recommended Decision re 36 Report and Recommendations. By JUDGE JOSEPH N LAPLANTE. (dfr)
August 18, 2014 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: adopting Report and Recommended Decision re 65 Report and Recommendations. By JUDGE JOSEPH N LAPLANTE. (mjlt)
March 31, 2015 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting Report and Recommended Decision re 92 -granting 68 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 72 Motion for Default Judgment; denying 73 Motion for Entry of Default By JUDGE JOSEPH N LAPLANTE. (dfr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HOOKER v. USA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAMUEL HOOKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: JOHN G. OSBORN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERAL MARSHALS SERVICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.