GOODRICH v. SHEEHAN, ESQ et al

Plaintiff: STEPHEN GOODRICH
Defendant: MICHAEL L SHEEHAN, ESQ and PRETI FLAHERTY BELIVEAU & PACHIOS CHARTERED LLP
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv00388
Filed: December 19, 2012
 
Court: Maine District Court
Office: Portland Office
County: Cumberland
Referring Judge: JOHN H. RICH
Presiding Judge: JOHN A. WOODCOCK
 
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 24, 2014 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER overruling 101 Objections to Order on Motion for Sanctions. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
September 28, 2014 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 104 Motion to Exclude Expert Witness and 104 Motion for Sanctions By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (jgw)
December 26, 2013 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER affirming 39 Report and Recommendations; denying 16 Motion to Dismiss By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (jgw)
August 8, 2014 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 81 Motion for Sanctions on Supplemental Expert Disclosures By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (jgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: GOODRICH v. SHEEHAN, ESQ et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHEN GOODRICH
Represented By: ERIC GOLDBERG
Represented By: MICHAEL B. COSENTINO
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL L SHEEHAN, ESQ
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRETI FLAHERTY BELIVEAU & PACHIOS CHARTERED LLP
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]