Blind Industries and Services of Maryland et al v. Route 40 Paintball Park

Plaintiff: James Konechne, Ronald Cagle, Blind Industries and Services of Maryland and Marco Carranza
Defendant: Route 40 Paintball Park
Case Number: 1:2011cv03562
Filed: December 12, 2011
Court: Maryland District Court
Office: Baltimore Office
County: Baltimore County
Presiding Judge: William M Nickerson
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 17, 2012 21 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION granting in part and denying in part 13 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 7/17/12. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
September 26, 2012 29 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 9/26/12. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
December 5, 2012 32 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge William M Nickerson on 12/5/12. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
March 21, 2013 59 Opinion or Order of the Court Finding of Fact and Conclusions of Law. Signed by Judge William M Nickerson on 3/21/13. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blind Industries and Services of Maryland et al v. Route 40 Paintball Park
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Konechne
Represented By: Gregory P Care
Represented By: Stuart Oswald Simms
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Cagle
Represented By: Gregory P Care
Represented By: Stuart Oswald Simms
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blind Industries and Services of Maryland
Represented By: Stuart Oswald Simms
Represented By: Gregory P Care
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marco Carranza
Represented By: Stuart Oswald Simms
Represented By: Gregory P Care
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Route 40 Paintball Park
Represented By: Kelly M Marzullo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]