Pisani v. Baltimore City Police et al

Defendant: Ian Dombrowski, Baltimore City Police and Margaret Barillaro
Plaintiff: Bryan M. Pisani
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv01654
Filed: June 5, 2012
 
Court: Maryland District Court
Office: Baltimore Office
County: Baltimore City
Presiding Judge: William D Quarles
 
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
February 6, 2014 15 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 2/6/14. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (c/m 2/6/14-das)
April 8, 2014 18 Featured Case REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 17 Second MOTION for Sanctions filed by Baltimore City Police; Objections to R&R due by 4/25/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 4/8/14. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (c/m to plaintiff 4/9/14-das)
August 14, 2013 7 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge William D Quarles, Jr on 8/14/13. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (c/m 8/14/13-das)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Pisani v. Baltimore City Police et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ian Dombrowski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baltimore City Police
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Barillaro
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan M. Pisani
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]