Mould v. NJG Food Service, Inc. et al

Defendant: OC Crabbag, LLC, NJG Food Service, Inc., Nolen J. Graves and Albert Levy
Plaintiff: Jeffrey B. Mould
Case Number: 1:2013cv01305
Filed: May 1, 2013
Court: Maryland District Court
Office: Baltimore Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: James K. Bredar
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 11, 2014 147 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 4/11/14. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
June 17, 2014 161 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER DENYING 150 Motion for Reconsideration and/or Clarification. Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 6/17/14. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
June 17, 2014 162 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER GRANTING 155 Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer; GRANTING 160 Motion to Set Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule Count III. Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 6/17/14. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
June 18, 2014 164 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER DIRECTING Defendants file the proposed sealed exhibits re 103 Motion to Seal; GRANTING 122 Motion of Plaintiff to Seal; DIRECTING Defendants to file a motion to seal re 138 sealed documents. Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 6/18/14. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
August 8, 2014 174 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER GRANTING 103 Motion to Seal; GRANTING 165 Motion to Seal; GRANTING 166 Motion to Seal; GRANTING 171 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 8/8/14. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
August 12, 2014 175 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 08/12/2014. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
December 4, 2013 89 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 12/4/13. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
December 12, 2013 93 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 12/11/13. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
December 12, 2013 95 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER DENYING 22 Motion of Defendants to Compel Arbitration in case 1:13-cv-02183-JKB. Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 12/11/13. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-01305-JKB, 1:13-cv-02183-JKB(hmls, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mould v. NJG Food Service, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OC Crabbag, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NJG Food Service, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nolen J. Graves
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert Levy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey B. Mould
Represented By: Francis R Laws(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Julia Ann Carolan(Designation Retained)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]