Fundamental Administrative Services, LLC v. Anderson

Plaintiff: Fundamental Administrative Services, LLC
Defendant: Kristi Anderson
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv01708
Filed: June 13, 2013
 
Court: Maryland District Court
Office: Baltimore Office
County: Baltimore County
Presiding Judge: James K. Bredar
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 11, 2014 113 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Finding as Moot 68 Motion to Disqualify Counsel; Granting 101 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Steven Neal Leitess terminated. Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 06/11/0214. (bas, Deputy Clerk) .
June 30, 2014 120 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER finding as moot 119 Motion to Vacate. Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 06/27/2014. (jf2, Deputy Clerk)
June 26, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 14 MOTION for Reconsideration re 13 Order on Motion to Quash,. Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 6/26/2013. (aos, Deputy Clerk)
August 23, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying Defendant's 16 Motion for Sanctions; directing Defendant to respond to Plaintiff's 6 amended complaint. Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 8/22/13. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
October 10, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 10/9/2013. (aos, Deputy Clerk)
April 15, 2014 90 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Denying 27 Motion to Dismiss Verified Amended Complaint ; Granting 34 Motion for Leave to File a Verified Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 04/15/2014. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
May 2, 2014 97 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 45 MOTION to Alter/Amend Judgment or Alternatively, For Clarification by Kristi Anderson; denying 63 Supplemental MOTION to Alter/Amend Judgment or, Alternatively for Clarification as to Court's Memorandum and Preliminary Injunction by Kristi Anderson. Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 5/1/14. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Fundamental Administrative Services, LLC v. Anderson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fundamental Administrative Services, LLC
Represented By: Linda S Woolf(Designation Retained)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristi Anderson
Represented By: Steven Neal Leitess
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]