Reaching Hearts International, Inc. v. Prince George's County et al

Case Number: 8:2005cv01688
Filed: June 22, 2005
Court: Maryland District Court
Office: Greenbelt Office
Referring Judge: William Connelly
Presiding Judge: Roger W Titus
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 22, 2011 167 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 7/22/2011. (c h/d usms 7/22/2011 rk) (rank, Deputy Clerk)
September 23, 2011 195 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 9/23/11. Associated Cases: 8:11-cv-01959-RWT, 8:05-cv-01688-RWT(cms, Deputy Clerk)
December 21, 2011 208 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 12/21/2011. (ranks, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reaching Hearts International, Inc. v. Prince George's County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.