A Love of Food I, LLC v. Maoz Vegetarian USA, Inc. et al

Defendant: Maoz Vegetarian USA, Inc., Yair Marinov and Boaz Schweitzer
Plaintiff: A Love of Food I, LLC
Case Number: 8:2010cv02352
Filed: August 25, 2010
Court: Maryland District Court
Office: Greenbelt Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: Alexander Williams
Nature of Suit: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 7, 2011 10 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Alexander Williams, Jr on 07/07/2011. (elts, Deputy Clerk)
September 13, 2011 26 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Alexander Williams, Jr on 9/13/2011. (ranks, Deputy Clerk)
February 8, 2012 39 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Alexander Williams, Jr on 2/7/2012. (rss, Deputy Clerk)
June 29, 2012 55 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Alexander Williams, Jr on 6/28/2012. (kns, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A Love of Food I, LLC v. Maoz Vegetarian USA, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maoz Vegetarian USA, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yair Marinov
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boaz Schweitzer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A Love of Food I, LLC
Represented By: Steven K Fedder
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]