Fletcher et al v. Lamone et al

Plaintiff: Patricia Fletcher, Trevelyn Otts, Donald M. Glover, Janis Hagey, Winnie Mae Campbell, Michael Harris, Michael Thompson, Julia L. Williams and Robina Spruill
Defendant: Linda H. Lamone and Robert L. Walker
Intervenor_plaintiff: C. James Olson, C. Paul Smith, Ronald George, Carl F. Middledorf, Antonio Wade Campbell and Philip J. Smith
Amicus: Howard University School of Law, Civil Rights Clinic, NAACP Legal Defense & Education Fund, Inc., Maryland State Conference of NAACP Branches, Somerset County Branch of the NAACP, American Civil Liberties Union of Maryland, DEMOS: A Network for Action and Ideas and Prison Police Initiative
 
Case Number: 8:2011cv03220
Filed: November 10, 2011
 
Court: Maryland District Court
Office: Greenbelt Office
County: Baltimore City
Presiding Judge: Roger W Titus
 
Nature of Suit: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 16, 2011 12 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER directing defendants to file any opposition to plaintiff's motion to convene by 11/18/2011 at 2:00 p.m. Plaintiffs are directed to file their reply by 11/21/11 at 2:00 p.m.. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 11/16/11. (cms, Deputy Clerk)
November 21, 2011 17 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 11/21/2011. (rank, Deputy Clerk)
December 1, 2011 21 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 15 Plaintiffs Motion to Propose Schedule. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 12/1/11. (cms, Deputy Clerk)
December 5, 2011 36 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 12/2/2011. (rss, Deputy Clerk)
December 23, 2011 54 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION of the Three-Judge Court. Signed by Judge Paul V. Niemeyer for the Court on 12/23/2011. (rank, Deputy Clerk)
November 15, 2011 6 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER scheduling a telephone status conference on November 16, 2011 at 2:30 p.m.. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 11/15/11. (cms, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Fletcher et al v. Lamone et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Fletcher
Represented By: Jason Brett Torchinsky
Represented By: James Paul Mayes
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trevelyn Otts
Represented By: Jason Brett Torchinsky
Represented By: James Paul Mayes
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald M. Glover
Represented By: Jason Brett Torchinsky
Represented By: James Paul Mayes
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janis Hagey
Represented By: Jason Brett Torchinsky
Represented By: James Paul Mayes
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Winnie Mae Campbell
Represented By: Jason Brett Torchinsky
Represented By: James Paul Mayes
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Harris
Represented By: Jason Brett Torchinsky
Represented By: James Paul Mayes
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Thompson
Represented By: Jason Brett Torchinsky
Represented By: James Paul Mayes
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia L. Williams
Represented By: Jason Brett Torchinsky
Represented By: James Paul Mayes
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robina Spruill
Represented By: Jason Brett Torchinsky
Represented By: James Paul Mayes
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda H. Lamone
Represented By: Kathryn M Rowe
Represented By: Dan Friedman
Represented By: Adam Dean Snyder
Represented By: Steven M Sullivan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L. Walker
Represented By: Dan Friedman
Represented By: Kathryn M Rowe
Represented By: Adam Dean Snyder
Represented By: Steven M Sullivan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: C. James Olson
Represented By: Clarence Paul Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: C. Paul Smith
Represented By: Clarence Paul Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Ronald George
Represented By: Clarence Paul Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Carl F. Middledorf
Represented By: Clarence Paul Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Antonio Wade Campbell
Represented By: Clarence Paul Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Philip J. Smith
Represented By: Clarence Paul Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Howard University School of Law, Civil Rights Clinic
Represented By: Ajmel Quereshi
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: NAACP Legal Defense & Education Fund, Inc.
Represented By: Ajmel Quereshi
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Maryland State Conference of NAACP Branches
Represented By: Deborah A Jeon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Somerset County Branch of the NAACP
Represented By: Deborah A Jeon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: American Civil Liberties Union of Maryland
Represented By: Deborah A Jeon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: DEMOS: A Network for Action and Ideas
Represented By: Dale Ho
Represented By: Deborah A Jeon
Represented By: Ajmel Quereshi
Represented By: Brenda Wright
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Prison Police Initiative
Represented By: Deborah A Jeon
Represented By: Aleks Kajstura
Represented By: Peter J Wagner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]