United States of America v. One 2003 Mercedes Benz CL500 VIN WDBPJ75J353A033241

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: One 2003 Mercedes Benz CL500 VIN WDBPJ75J353A033241
Case Number: 8:2011cv03571
Filed: December 13, 2011
Court: Maryland District Court
Office: Greenbelt Office
County: Baltimore City
Presiding Judge: Alexander Williams
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 3, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 10/3/2013. (c/m 10/3/2013 eb) (ebs2, Deputy Clerk)
December 17, 2014 17 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM and ORDER Granting 16 the Government's Renewed Motion for Default Judgment and Order of Forfeiture; Entering Default Judgment in favor of the United States of America against the Mercedes; Forefeiting the Mercedes to the United States pursuant to 21 USC 881(a)(6); Authorizing the Attorney General, or a designee, to seize the Mercedes. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 12/17/2014. (c/m 12/18/14 jf2s, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 12/18/2014 (jf2s, Deputy Clerk).
July 15, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 7/15/2013. (c/m 7/15/2013 eb)(ebs2, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. One 2003 Mercedes Benz CL500 VIN WDBPJ75J353A033241
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: James A Crowell, IV
Represented By: Rod J Rosenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One 2003 Mercedes Benz CL500 VIN WDBPJ75J353A033241
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.