Metro Media Entertainment, LLC v. Does 1 - 47

Plaintiff: Metro Media Entertainment, LLC
Defendant: Does 1 - 47
 
Case Number: 8:2012cv00347
Filed: February 6, 2012
 
Court: Maryland District Court
Office: Greenbelt Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Deborah K. Chasanow
 
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 27, 2014 110 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 8/27/14. (sat, Chambers)
December 14, 2012 67 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 12/14/12. (sat, Chambers)
April 30, 2013 92 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 4/30/13. (sat, Chambers)
July 16, 2013 99 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM and ORDER OVERRULING 97 Plaintiff's objection to the court's June 13 ruling. Signed by Chief Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 7/16/13. (sat, Chambers)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Metro Media Entertainment, LLC v. Does 1 - 47
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Metro Media Entertainment, LLC
Represented By: Mike Meier
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 - 47
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]