Hart et al v. Bed Bath & Beyond Inc.

Plaintiff: Rebecca Hart and Michael Hart
Defendant: Bed Bath & Beyond Inc.
Case Number: 8:2013cv00868
Filed: March 22, 2013
Court: Maryland District Court
Office: Greenbelt Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Peter J. Messitte
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 22, 2014 118 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 9/22/2014. (aos, Deputy Clerk)
October 8, 2014 133 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM/ ORDER deferring ruling on 124 MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Losorea Packaging, Inc. ; granting in part 125 MOTION to Stay All Judicial Proceedings and to Enlarge Time With Respect to Losorea Packaging, Inc. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 10/8/2014. (aos, Deputy Clerk)
November 6, 2013 48 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 11/6/2013. (kns, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hart et al v. Bed Bath & Beyond Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Hart
Represented By: David E Haynes(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Hart
Represented By: David E Haynes(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bed Bath & Beyond Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.