Connectu, Inc. v. Facebook, Inc. et al Featured Case

ConnectU sued Facebook and its executives for copyright infringement, breach of actual or implied contract, misappropriation of trade secrets, breach of fiduciary duty, unjust enrichment, unfair business practices, intentional interference with prospective business advantage, breach of duty of good faith and fair dealing, fraud and breach of confidence. Facebook also sued ConnectU for business torts and unfair business practices.

ConnectU
Facebook

Defendant: Mark Zuckerberg, Dustin Moskovitz, Facebook, Inc., Christopher Hughes, Andrew McCollum, Eduardo Saverin and Thefacebook LLC
Plaintiff: Connectu, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2007cv10593
Filed: March 28, 2007
Court: Massachusetts District Court
Office: Boston Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Douglas P. Woodlock
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 28, 2011 378 Withdrawal of motion: 364 MOTION Reasserting 338 MOTION Motion For Access To Pleadings and Discovery Files filed by Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, Divya Narendra, 354 MOTION to Preserve Information Needed for Rule 60(b) Motion filed by Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, Divya Narendra, 359 MOTION for Discovery Under Fed.R.Civ.P.60(B) filed by Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, Divya Narendra.. (Meade, Tyler)
September 27, 2011 377 DECLARATION re 376 Opposition to Motion, Originally filed as Dkt 367 by Facebook, Inc., Christopher Hughes, Andrew McCollum, Dustin Moskovitz, Eduardo Saverin, Thefacebook LLC, Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11)(Chatterjee, I.)
September 27, 2011 376 Opposition re 354 MOTION to Preserve Information Needed for Rule 60(b) Motion, 359 MOTION for Discovery Under Fed.R.Civ.P.60(B) Corrected REDACTED Opposition to Replace Dkt 367 filed by Facebook, Inc., Christopher Hughes, Andrew McCollum, Dustin Moskovitz, Eduardo Saverin, Thefacebook LLC, Mark Zuckerberg. (Chatterjee, I.)
September 9, 2011 375 REPLY to Response to 359 MOTION for Discovery Under Fed.R.Civ.P.60(B) filed by Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss. (Meade, Tyler)
September 9, 2011 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 374 MOTION for Leave to File A Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion For Discovery Under Fed.R.Civ.P. 60(B) by Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Lovett, Jarrett)
September 8, 2011 374 MOTION for Leave to File A Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion For Discovery Under Fed.R.Civ.P. 60(B) by Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Meade, Tyler)
September 8, 2011 373 RESPONSE to Motion re 364 MOTION Reasserting 338 MOTION Motion For Access To Pleadings and Discovery Files with corrected certificate of service filed by Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett, & Dunner, LLP. (Higgins, Erin)
September 8, 2011 372 RESPONSE to Motion re 364 MOTION Reasserting 338 MOTION Motion For Access To Pleadings and Discovery Files filed by Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett, & Dunner, LLP. (Higgins, Erin)
September 7, 2011 371 Sealed Exhibit re 367 Opposition & Declaration of Monte Cooper by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2, # 2 Exhibit 3, # 3 Exhibit 4, # 4 Exhibit 7) (York, Steve)
September 7, 2011 370 Sealed Opposition re 367 Opposition to 354 Motion to Preserve Information Needed for Rule 60(b) 359 Motion for Discovery Under Fed.R.Civ.P.60(B) (Consolidated Opposition) filed by Facebook, Inc.. (York, Steve)
September 7, 2011 369 RESPONSE to Motion re 338 MOTION Motion For Access To Pleadings And Discovery Files filed by Facebook, Inc., Andrew McCollum, Dustin Moskovitz, Eduardo Saverin, Thefacebook LLC, Mark Zuckerberg. (Chatterjee, I.)
September 7, 2011 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 366 Assented to Motion to Seal Certain Documents. (Lovett, Jarrett)
September 2, 2011 368 Opposition re 359 MOTION for Discovery Under Fed.R.Civ.P.60(B) filed by Connectu, Inc.. (Buchanan, Alison) (Main Document 368 replaced on 9/8/2011) (York, Steve).
September 2, 2011 367 Opposition re 354 MOTION to Preserve Information Needed for Rule 60(b) Motion, 359 MOTION for Discovery Under Fed.R.Civ.P.60(B) (Consolidated Opposition) filed by Facebook, Inc., Andrew McCollum, Dustin Moskovitz, Eduardo Saverin, Thefacebook LLC, Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Monte Cooper, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11)(Chatterjee, I.)
September 2, 2011 366 MOTION to Seal by Facebook, Inc., Andrew McCollum, Dustin Moskovitz, Eduardo Saverin, Thefacebook LLC, Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Chatterjee, I.)
August 29, 2011 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. APPROVING 365 Stipulation, filed by Mark Zuckerberg, Andrew McCollum, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Eduardo Saverin, Dustin Moskovitz: Response to 354 MOTION to Preserve Information Needed for Rule 60(b) Motion is due by 9/2/11, and a consolidated response to said motion and 359 MOTION for Discovery Under Fed.R.Civ.P.60(B) is permitted to be filed. (Lovett, Jarrett)
August 25, 2011 365 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Enlarging Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Preserve and Permitting Defendants to File a Single Consolidated Response by Facebook, Inc., Andrew McCollum, Dustin Moskovitz, Eduardo Saverin, Thefacebook LLC, Mark Zuckerberg. (Cooper, Monte)
August 25, 2011 364 MOTION Reasserting 338 MOTION Motion For Access To Pleadings and Discovery Files by Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss.(Meade, Tyler)
August 25, 2011 363 NOTICE of Appearance by I. Neel Chatterjee on behalf of Eduardo Saverin (Chatterjee, I.)
August 24, 2011 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 362 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss. (Lovett, Jarrett)
August 19, 2011 362 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss.(Meade, Tyler)
August 19, 2011 361 AFFIDAVIT in Support re 359 MOTION for discovery under Rule 60(b) filed by Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19)(Meade, Tyler)
August 19, 2011 360 MEMORANDUM in Support re 359 MOTION for discovery under Rule 60(b) filed by Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss. (Meade, Tyler)
August 19, 2011 359 MOTION for Discovery Under Fed.R.Civ.P.60(B) by Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss.(Meade, Tyler)
August 16, 2011 358 NOTICE by Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett, & Dunner, LLP Regarding Discovery Materials and Protective Orders (Higgins, Erin)
August 16, 2011 357 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin K. Higgins on behalf of Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett, & Dunner, LLP (Higgins, Erin)
August 15, 2011 356 AFFIDAVIT in Support re 354 MOTION to Preserve Evidence Information Needed For Rule 60(b) Motion filed by Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Schrag, Michael)
August 15, 2011 355 MEMORANDUM in Support re 354 MOTION to Preserve Evidence Information Needed For Rule 60(b) Motion filed by Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss. (Schrag, Michael)
August 15, 2011 354 MOTION to Preserve Information Needed for Rule 60(b) Motion by Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss.(Schrag, Michael)
July 22, 2011 Civil Case Terminated. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-10593-DPW, 1:04-cv-11923-DPW(York, Steve)
July 22, 2011 353 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ENDORSED ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASEAssociated Cases: 1:07-cv-10593-DPW, 1:04-cv-11923-DPW(York, Steve)
July 22, 2011 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. finding as moot (347 in 1:07-cv-10593-DPW) MOTION for Joinder in Facebook Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Access to Pleadings and Discovery Files filed by Eduardo Saverin Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-10593-DPW, 1:04-cv-11923-DPW(York, Steve)
July 22, 2011 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered finding as moot (348) Motion For Scheduling Order in case 1:07-cv-10593-DPW Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-10593-DPW, 1:04-cv-11923-DPW(York, Steve)
July 22, 2011 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered finding as moot (338) Motion For Access To Pleadings And Discovery Files in case 1:07-cv-10593-DPW Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-10593-DPW, 1:04-cv-11923-DPW(York, Steve)
July 22, 2011 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered finding as moot (324) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 1:07-cv-10593-DPW Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-10593-DPW, 1:04-cv-11923-DPW(York, Steve)
July 22, 2011 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered finding as moot (321) Motion for Clarification in case 1:07-cv-10593-DPW Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-10593-DPW, 1:04-cv-11923-DPW(York, Steve)
July 22, 2011 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered finding as moot (295) Sealed Motion in case 1:07-cv-10593-DPW Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-10593-DPW, 1:04-cv-11923-DPW(York, Steve)
July 22, 2011 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered finding as moot (291) Motion For Limited Relief From Stay and to Enjoin Individual Plaintiffs and Their Counsel in case 1:07-cv-10593-DPW Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-10593-DPW, 1:04-cv-11923-DPW(York, Steve)
July 22, 2011 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered finding as moot (283) Sealed Motion in case 1:07-cv-10593-DPW Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-10593-DPW, 1:04-cv-11923-DPW(York, Steve)
July 22, 2011 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting (340) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:07-cv-10593-DPW Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-10593-DPW, 1:04-cv-11923-DPW(York, Steve)
July 21, 2011 352 RESPONSE to Motion re 340 MOTION to Dismiss - Motion to Reassert Previous Motions to Dismiss (Docket Nos. 232, 233 and 243) MOTION to Dismiss - Motion to Reassert Previous Motions to Dismiss (Docket Nos. 232, 233 and 243) filed by Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss. (Meade, Tyler)
July 19, 2011 351 Sealed Opposition re 345 Opposition re 338 MOTION Motion For Access To Pleadings And Discovery Files filed by Christopher Hughes, Andrew McCollum, Dustin Moskovitz, Mark Zuckerberg. (York, Steve)
July 18, 2011 350 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE pursuant to LR 5.2 by Facebook, Inc., Christopher Hughes, Andrew McCollum, Dustin Moskovitz, Mark Zuckerberg re 343 MOTION to Seal Service of Sealed Documents. (Chatterjee, I.)
July 18, 2011 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 343 MOTION to Seal by Christopher Hughes, Andrew McCollum, Dustin Moskovitz, Thefacebook LLC, Mark Zuckerberg. (Lovett, Jarrett)
July 15, 2011 349 MEMORANDUM in Support re 348 MOTION Motion For Scheduling Order filed by Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss. (Meade, Tyler)
July 15, 2011 348 MOTION Motion For Scheduling Order by Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss.(Meade, Tyler)
July 15, 2011 347 MOTION for Joinder in Facebook Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Access to Pleadings and Discovery Files by Eduardo Saverin.(Chatterjee, I.)
July 15, 2011 346 NOTICE of Appearance by I. Neel Chatterjee on behalf of Eduardo Saverin (Chatterjee, I.)
July 15, 2011 345 Opposition re 338 MOTION Motion For Access To Pleadings And Discovery Files filed by Facebook, Inc., Christopher Hughes, Andrew McCollum, Dustin Moskovitz, Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Monte Cooper, # 2 Exhibit Ex. 1 to Cooper Decl., # 3 Exhibit Ex. 2 to Cooper Decl., # 4 Exhibit Ex. 3 to Cooper Decl., # 5 Exhibit Ex. 4 to Cooper Decl., # 6 Exhibit Ex. 5 to Cooper Decl., # 7 Exhibit Ex. 6 to Cooper Decl., # 8 Exhibit Ex. 7 to Cooper Decl., # 9 Exhibit Ex. 8 to Cooper Decl., # 10 Exhibit Ex. 9 to Cooper Decl., # 11 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 10 to Cooper Decl., # 12 Exhibit Ex. 11 to Cooper Decl., # 13 Exhibit Ex. 12 to Cooper Decl., # 14 Exhibit Ex. 13 to Cooper Decl.)(Chatterjee, I.) (Attachment 11 replaced on 7/19/2011) (York, Steve).
July 15, 2011 344 Opposition re 338 MOTION Motion For Access To Pleadings And Discovery Files ConnectU, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Access to Pleadings and Discoverable Files filed by Connectu, Inc.. (Buchanan, Alison)
July 15, 2011 343 MOTION to Seal by Christopher Hughes, Andrew McCollum, Dustin Moskovitz, Thefacebook LLC, Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Chatterjee, I.)
July 13, 2011 E-Mail Notice re originally issued on July 12, 2011 returned as undeliverable. Name of Addressee: James Towery. Attorney's email address removed from CM/ECF database to prevent the return of additional undeliverable email notices. (Hurley, Virginia)
July 13, 2011 E-Mail Notice originally issued on July 12, 2011 returned as undeliverable. Name of Addressee: Yvonne Greer. Attorney's email address removed from ECF database to prevent the return of additional undeliverable email notices. (Hurley, Virginia)
July 12, 2011 E-Mail Notice re originally issued on July 7, 2011 returned as undeliverable. Name of Addressee: Nathan Shaforth and Annette Hurst. Email addresses for both attorneys removed from ECF database to prevent the return of additional undeliverable email notices. (Hurley, Virginia)
July 12, 2011 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 342 Asented to Motion to Withdraw as Attorney re Jeremy P. Oczek. (Lovett, Jarrett)
July 11, 2011 342 Assented to MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Jeremy P. Oczek by Facebook, Inc., Christopher Hughes, Andrew McCollum, Dustin Moskovitz, Thefacebook LLC, Mark Zuckerberg.(Devarasetty, Sharada)
July 7, 2011 341 NOTICE of Appearance by Sharada Devarasetty on behalf of Facebook, Inc., Christopher Hughes, Andrew McCollum, Dustin Moskovitz, Thefacebook LLC, Mark Zuckerberg (Devarasetty, Sharada)
July 7, 2011 340 MOTION to Dismiss - Motion to Reassert Previous Motions to Dismiss (Docket Nos. 232, 233 and 243) by Facebook, Inc., Andrew McCollum, Dustin Moskovitz, Thefacebook LLC, Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit M. Cooper Declaration ISO Motion)(Cooper, Monte)
July 1, 2011 339 MEMORANDUM in Support re 338 MOTION Motion For Access To Pleadings And Discovery Files filed by Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Tyler Meade In Support of Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss and Divya Narendra's Motion For Access To Pleadings And Discovery Files, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8)(Meade, Tyler)
July 1, 2011 338 MOTION Motion For Access To Pleadings And Discovery Files by Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss.(Meade, Tyler)
June 23, 2011 337 STATUS REPORT by Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8)(Meade, Tyler)
June 1, 2011 336 STATUS REPORT by Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Meade, Tyler)
May 26, 2011 335 STATUS REPORT And Notice of Appellate Ruling From Ninth Circuit by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Sutton, Theresa)
April 20, 2011 334 STATUS REPORT by Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Meade, Tyler)
April 15, 2011 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 333 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Tyler R. Meade and Michael L. Schrag. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (York, Steve)
April 15, 2011 333 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Tyler R. Meade and Michael L. Schrag Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-3364567 by Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Tyler R. Meade, Esq., # 2 Affidavit of Michael L. Schrag, Esq.)(Guray, Arthur)
April 12, 2011 332 NOTICE by Facebook, Inc., Christopher Hughes, Andrew McCollum, Dustin Moskovitz, Thefacebook LLC, Mark Zuckerberg re 274 Order on Motion to Disqualify Counsel, Order on Motion for Sanctions, Order on Motion to Stay, Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, OF APPELLATE RULING FROM NINTH CIRCUIT IN (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - CA9 Opinion)(Sutton, Theresa)
June 29, 2010 331 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Robert M. Mendillo (Mendillo, Robert)
February 10, 2010 330 REPLY to Response to 324 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Connectu, Inc., Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss, Divya Narendra. (Hornick, John)
February 10, 2010 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Electronic ORDER entered granting 329 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Facebook, Inc.'s Response and Connectu Inc.'s Limited Opposition to Finnegan Henderson Farabow Garrett & Dunner LLP's Motion for Leave to Withdraw Appearance; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Lovett, Jarrett)
February 9, 2010 329 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Facebook, Inc.'s Response and Connectu Inc.'s Limited Opposition to Finnegan Henderson Farabow Garrett & Dunner LLP's Motion for Leave to Withdraw Appearance by Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss, Divya Narendra. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hornick, John)
February 4, 2010 328 DECLARATION re 327 Response to Motion by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Cooper, Monte)
February 4, 2010 327 RESPONSE to Motion re 324 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Cooper, Monte)
February 4, 2010 326 Opposition re 324 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Limited Opposition) filed by Connectu, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Bailey, Gregg)
February 2, 2010 325 Letter/request (non-motion) from Robert M. Mendillo re: Arbitration Panel's Request to Review Three (3) Documents in camera. (Attachments: # 1 Letter from Sean O'Shea)(Mendillo, Robert)
January 21, 2010 324 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett, & Dunner, LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Esquenet, Margaret)
January 21, 2010 323 RESPONSE to Motion re 321 MOTION for Clarification of Order or Motion to Lift Stay to Reassert Motion to Disqualify Counsel filed by Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett, & Dunner, LLP. (Esquenet, Margaret)
January 7, 2010 322 MEMORANDUM in Support re 321 MOTION for Clarification of Order or Motion to Lift Stay to Reassert Motion to Disqualify Counsel filed by Connectu, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Bailey, Gregg)
January 7, 2010 321 MOTION for Clarification of Order or Motion to Lift Stay to Reassert Motion to Disqualify Counsel by Connectu, Inc..(Bailey, Gregg)
November 25, 2009 320 Facebook's Sealed Reply Memorandum in support of their 295 Motion For Limited Relief From Stay and to Enjoin Individual Plaintiffs and Their Counsel. (York, Steve)
November 25, 2009 319 Notice of Withdrawal by 02138 and Request to Remove Counsel for 02138 from Service List (Ritvo, Elizabeth) Modified on 12/2/2009 (York, Steve).
November 25, 2009 318 REPLY to Response to 291 MOTION For Limited Relief From Stay and to Enjoin Individual Plaintiffs and Their Counsel filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Sutton, Theresa)
November 25, 2009 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Electronic ORDER entered granting 315 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Facebook's Reply Memorandum In Support of 291 Motion to Enjoin Plaintiffs and Their Counsel by Facebook, Inc.; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Lovett, Jarrett)
November 24, 2009 317 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc. re 315 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Facebook's Reply Memorandum In Support of Motion to Enjoin Plaintiffs and Their Counsel (Confidential Ex. A - Reply). (Sutton, Theresa)
November 24, 2009 316 DECLARATION re 315 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Facebook's Reply Memorandum In Support of Motion to Enjoin Plaintiffs and Their Counsel by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Sutton, Theresa)
November 24, 2009 315 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Facebook's Reply Memorandum In Support of Motion to Enjoin Plaintiffs and Their Counsel by Facebook, Inc..(Sutton, Theresa)
November 24, 2009 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Electronic ORDER entered granting 314 Assented to MOTION to Seal Facebook's Reply In Support of Motion to Enjoin by Facebook, Inc. (Lovett, Jarrett)
November 23, 2009 314 Assented to MOTION to Seal Facebook's Reply In Support of Motion to Enjoin by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sutton, Theresa)
November 23, 2009 307 Sealed Reply by Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss, Divya Narendra. (York, Steve)
November 20, 2009 306 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Laurence F. Pulgram (Pulgram, Laurence)
November 20, 2009 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Electronic ORDER entered granting 305 Sealed Motion for leave to file Reply by Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss, Divya Narendra. (Lovett, Jarrett)
November 19, 2009 313 Sealed Declaration of Sean F. O'Shea in further Support of 283 Motion for Limited Relief from Protective Order and in Opposition to Facebook 291 Motion to Enjoin. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to 14, # 2 Exhibit 15 to 32)(York, Steve)
November 19, 2009 312 Sealed Declaration of Jeff Parmet in further Support of 283 Motion for Limited Relief from Protective Order and in Opposition to Facebook 291 Motion to Enjoin. (York, Steve)
November 19, 2009 311 Sealed Declaration of Tyler Winklevoss in further Support of 283 Motion for Limited Relief from Protective Order and in Opposition to Facebook 291 Motion to Enjoin.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Audio/Video CD)(York, Steve)
November 19, 2009 310 Sealed Declaration of Cameron Winklevoss in further Support of 283 Motion for Limited Relief from Protective Order and in Opposition to Facebook 291 Motion to Enjoin. (York, Steve)
November 19, 2009 309 Sealed Response to Facebook's 291 Motion For Limited Relief From Stay and to Enjoin Individual Plaintiffs and Their Counsel. (York, Steve)
November 19, 2009 308 Sealed Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Facebook 295 Sealed Motion re 291 MOTION For Limited Relief From Stay and to Enjoin Individual Plaintiffs and Their Counsel. (York, Steve)
November 19, 2009 305 Sealed Motion for leave to file Reply by Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss, Divya Narendra. (Attachments: # 1 Reply)(York, Steve)
November 19, 2009 304 NOTICE OF MANUAL FILING by Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss, Divya Narendra Motion for Leave to File the Within Reply (Guray, Arthur)
November 17, 2009 303 NOTICE OF MANUAL FILING by Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss, Divya Narendra (Hornick, John)
November 16, 2009 302 Errata by Facebook, Inc. to 291 MOTION For Limited Relief From Stay and to Enjoin Individual Plaintiffs and Their Counsel. (Cooper, Monte)
November 16, 2009 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Electronic ORDER entered granting 300 Motion to Seal; granting 301 Motion to Seal. (Lovett, Jarrett)
November 13, 2009 301 Assented to MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' and Counsel's (Finnegan's) Response to Facebook's Motion for Limited Relief from Stay and to Enjoin Individual Plaintiffs and Their Counsel by Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss, Divya Narendra. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hornick, John)
November 13, 2009 300 Assented to MOTION to Seal Opposition to Motion to Enjoin and Motion for Leave to File Within Reply by Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss, Divya Narendra.(Mendillo, Robert)
November 13, 2009 299 Letter/request (non-motion) from Robert M. Mendillo updating the Court on the status of the pending arbitration. (Mendillo, Robert)
November 9, 2009 298 Errata by Facebook, Inc. to 291 MOTION For Limited Relief From Stay and to Enjoin Individual Plaintiffs and Their Counsel. (Cooper, Monte)
November 5, 2009 297 Sealed Exhibit 8, 9, 10, 12, 13, 21 re 292 DECLARATION re 291 MOTION For Limited Relief From Stay and to Enjoin Individual Plaintiffs and Their Counsel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 9, # 2 Exhibit 10, # 3 Exhibit 12, # 4 Exhibit 13, # 5 Exhibit 21)(York, Steve)
November 5, 2009 296 Sealed Memorandum re 295 SEALED MOTION re 291 MOTION For Limited Relief From Stay and to Enjoin Individual Plaintiffs and Their Counsel. (York, Steve)
November 5, 2009 295 SEALED MOTION re 291 MOTION For Limited Relief From Stay and to Enjoin Individual Plaintiffs and Their Counsel by Facebook, Inc..(York, Steve)
November 5, 2009 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Electronic ORDER entered granting 286 MOTION to Seal Document(s) by Facebook, Inc. (Lovett, Jarrett)
November 4, 2009 294 Facebook's Sealed Opposition to 283 Sealed Motion for Limited Relief From Stay. (Attachments: # 1 Sealed Exhibit A, # 2 Sealed Exhibit G)(York, Steve)
November 3, 2009 293 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc. re 291 MOTION For Limited Relief From Stay and to Enjoin Individual Plaintiffs and Their Counsel, 292 Declaration,,. (Cooper, Monte)
November 3, 2009 292 DECLARATION re 291 MOTION For Limited Relief From Stay and to Enjoin Individual Plaintiffs and Their Counsel by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8 - Notice of Manual Filing, # 9 Exhibit 9 - Notice of Manual Filing, # 10 Exhibit 10 - Notice of Manual Filing, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12 - Notice of Manual Filing, # 13 Exhibit 13 - Notice of Manual Filing, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21 - Notice of Manual Filing)(Cooper, Monte)
November 3, 2009 291 MOTION For Limited Relief From Stay and to Enjoin Individual Plaintiffs and Their Counsel by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Manual Filing, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Monte)
November 3, 2009 290 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Margaret A. Esquenet (Esquenet, Margaret)
November 3, 2009 289 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc. re 287 Opposition to Motion, 288 Declaration,. (Sutton, Theresa)
November 3, 2009 288 DECLARATION re 287 Opposition to Motion by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Notice of Manual Filing, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G - Notice of Manual Filing)(Sutton, Theresa)
November 3, 2009 287 Notice of Filing an Opposition re 283 Counter Defendant Sealed Motion filed by Facebook, Inc.. with the clerks office. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sutton, Theresa)
November 3, 2009 286 MOTION to Seal Facebook's Motion to Enjoin Iand Exhibits 8, 9, 10, 12, 13 and 21 to Cooper Declaration, MOTION to Seal Document ( Responses due by 11/17/2009) by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sutton, Theresa)
November 3, 2009 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Electronic ORDER entered granting 285 Assented to MOTION to Seal Un-Redacted Opposition to Motion for Limited Relief from Stay and Exhibits A and G to Declaration in Support Thereof by Facebook, Inc. (Lovett, Jarrett)
November 3, 2009 285 MOTION to Seal Un-Redacted Opposition to Motion for Limited Relief from Stay and Exhibits A and G to Declaration in Support Thereof by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sutton, Theresa)
October 22, 2009 283 Counter Defendant Sealed Motion by Divya Narendra. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(York, Steve)
October 22, 2009 282 Sealed Affidavit of Sean F. O'Shea Volumes I & II by Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss, Divya Narendra. (York, Steve)
October 21, 2009 281 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss, Divya Narendra (Amended). (Mendillo, Robert)
October 20, 2009 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Electronic ORDER entered granting 279 Motion for impoundment (Woodlock, Douglas)
October 19, 2009 280 Letter/request (non-motion) from Robert M. Mendillo Re Assented-to Motion for Impoundment. (Mendillo, Robert)
October 8, 2009 279 Assented to MOTION for Impoundment by Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss, Divya Narendra.(Mendillo, Robert)
October 8, 2009 278 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert M. Mendillo on behalf of Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss, Divya Narendra (Mendillo, Robert)
October 8, 2009 277 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter E. Ball on behalf of Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss, Divya Narendra (Ball, Peter)
October 8, 2009 276 NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur J. Guray on behalf of Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss, Divya Narendra (Guray, Arthur)
September 30, 2009 275 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER entered. Case stayed and all outstanding motions terminated without prejudice in accordance with this Court's Memorandum and Order issued on 9/30/09.Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-10593-DPW, 1:04-cv-11923-DPW(Lovett, Jarrett)
September 30, 2009 274 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered directing the Clerk to stay this case and terminate all outstanding motions without prejudice to the motion of any party to reassert them no later than 30 days after the issuance of any mandate of the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit concerning the judgment entered by the United States District Court for the Northern District of California in Civil Action No. 07-01389-JW. Counsel in these cases are ORDERED to notify this Court with a status report within 10 days of any material developments concerning the continued vitality of the Northern District of California judgment; accordingly terminating 262 Motion to Disqualify Counsel.; terminating 212 Motion for Sanctions; terminating 227 Motion to Stay; terminating 232 Motion to Dismiss; terminating 233 Motion to Dismiss (Woodlock, Douglas)
September 3, 2009 273 NOTICE by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg OF ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISQUALIFY COUNSEL (Sutton, Theresa)
August 11, 2009 272 NOTICE by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Connectu, Inc., Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg re 263 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 262 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel Notice of Entry of Order Remanding ConnectU, Inc.'s Motion to Disqualify Counsel to the District Court, Order Requiring Further Briefing and Setting Hearing on ConnectU's Motion to Disqualify, and the Parties' Responses Thereto (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit)(Sutton, Theresa)
July 28, 2009 E-Mail Notice re Entry #271 originally issued on 7/28/09 returned as undeliverable. Name of Addressee: Daniel Kaufman. The ECF help desk has contacted the law firm on record, who advised that the attorney is no longer employed by that firm. The attorney's email address has been removed from the database to prevent the return of additional undelivered email notices. (Jones, Sherry)
July 28, 2009 271 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, a copy of which is attached to this entry.. (Scalfani, Deborah)
July 28, 2009 270 EXCERPT Transcript of Motion Hearing held on June 2, 2008, before Judge Woodlock. Court Reporter: Diane M. Molas at 267/977-2909. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Redaction Request due 8/17/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/25/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/23/2009. (Scalfani, Deborah) Modified on 7/28/2009 (Scalfani, Deborah).
February 27, 2009 269 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Daniel K. Hampton (Hampton, Daniel)
February 26, 2009 268 REPLY to Response to 262 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel (Leave to File Granted on February 23, 2009) filed by Connectu, Inc.. (Durney, Peter)
February 23, 2009 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Electronic ORDER entered granting 267 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File A Brief in Reply to ConnectU Founders' Memorandum in Opposition to ConnectU, Inc.'s Motion to Disqualify Counsel by Connectu, Inc.; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Lovett, Jarrett)
February 20, 2009 267 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File A Brief in Reply to ConnectU Founders' Memorandum in Opposition to ConnectU, Inc.'s Motion to Disqualify Counsel by Connectu, Inc..(Durney, Peter)
February 19, 2009 266 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 262 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel filed by Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss, Divya Narendra. (Hornick, John)
January 28, 2009 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Electronic ORDER entered granting 265 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time until 2/19/09 to File Response to 262 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel. (Lovett, Jarrett)
January 27, 2009 265 MOTION for Extension of Time to 02/19/2009 to oppose ConnectU Inc.'s Motion to Disqualify Counsel by Connectu, Inc., Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss, Divya Narendra. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hornick, John) Modified to remove duplicate text on 1/28/2009 (Seelye, Terri).
January 23, 2009 264 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Connectu, Inc. re 263 Memorandum in Support of Motion, Amended Certificate of Service to Declaration of James E. Towery. (Durney, Peter)
January 22, 2009 263 MEMORANDUM in Support re 262 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel filed by Connectu, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of James E. Towery, Esq, # 2 Exhibits to Declaration)(Durney, Peter) Modified to remove duplicate text on 1/23/2009 (Seelye, Terri).
January 22, 2009 262 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel by Connectu, Inc..(Durney, Peter)
January 22, 2009 261 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER entered granting substitution of attorney filed by Eduardo Saverin. re 260 (329 in 1:04-cv-11923-DPW)(Seelye, Terri)
January 20, 2009 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Electronic ORDER entered granting 248 MOTION to Seal Exhibits 1, 2, and 3 to Opposition to Motion to Stay by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Lovett, Jarrett)
January 16, 2009 260 Proposed Consent order granting substitution of Attorney by Eduardo Saverin.(Hampton, Daniel) Modified text & termed motion on 1/21/2009 (Seelye, Terri).
January 13, 2009 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Electronic ORDER entered granting 240 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Added Evan A. Parke for Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss and Divya Narendra. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Forms and then scroll down to CM/ECF Forms. (Seelye, Terri)
January 9, 2009 259 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Meredith H. Schoenfeld (Schoenfeld, Meredith)
January 8, 2009 E-Mail Notice re 258 originally issued on 1/7/09 returned as undeliverable. Name of Addressee: Bhanu Sadasivan. The ECF help desk has contacted the law firm on record, who advised that the firm in no longer in business. The attorney's email address has been removed from the database to prevent the return of additional undelivered email notices. Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-11923-DPW, 1:07-cv-10593-DPW(Jones, Sherry)
January 8, 2009 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Electronic ORDER entered granting 258 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Added Alison P. Buchanan and James E. Towery for Connectu, Inc.. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Forms and then scroll down to CM/ECF Forms. (Seelye, Terri)
January 7, 2009 258 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of James E. Towery and Alison F. Buchanan Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 01010000000002249712. by Connectu, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Bailey, Gregg)
December 31, 2008 257 NOTICE by Connectu, Inc. re 224 Response to Motion, Notice of Withdrawal from Motion for Sanction of Non-Dismissal and Joinder to Defendants Opposition to the ConnectU Founders Motion for Sanction of Non-Dismissal (Bailey, Gregg)
December 30, 2008 256 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg re 248 MOTION to Seal Exhibits 1, 2, and 3 to Opposition to Motion to Stay, 252 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, 251 Opposition to Motion, 254 Sealed Document. (Sutton, Theresa)
December 30, 2008 255 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter M. Durney on behalf of Connectu, Inc. (Durney, Peter)
December 29, 2008 254 Sealed Document: Exhibits 1-3 to the declaration of Theresa A. Sutton in support of Facebook defendants' opposition to plaintiffs' motion to stay. Related Documents 227 , 251 , 252 . (Seelye, Terri)
December 29, 2008 253 NOTICE by Connectu, Inc. re 251 Opposition to Motion, Joinder to Defendant Facebbook, Inc.'s Opposition to Founders' Sixth Motion to Stay (Bailey, Gregg)
December 29, 2008 252 AFFIDAVIT of Theresa A. Sutton in Opposition re 227 MOTION to Stay -- Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay Any Dismissal of Claims -- [to Sixth Motion to Stay filed by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 4, # 2 Exhibit 5, # 3 Exhibit 6, # 4 Exhibit 7, # 5 Exhibit 8, # 6 Exhibit 9, # 7 Exhibit 10, # 8 Exhibit 11)(Sutton, Theresa)
December 29, 2008 251 Opposition re 227 MOTION to Stay -- Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay Any Dismissal of Claims -- [to Sixth Motion to Stay] filed by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Sutton, Theresa)
December 29, 2008 250 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Connectu, Inc.. Amended Corporate Disclosure. (Bailey, Gregg)
December 29, 2008 249 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregg P. Bailey on behalf of Connectu, Inc. (Bailey, Gregg)
December 29, 2008 248 MOTION to Seal Exhibits 1, 2, and 3 to Opposition to Motion to Stay by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sutton, Theresa)
December 23, 2008 247 REPLY to Response to 212 MOTION for Sanctions of non-dismissal or in the alternative to vacate final judgment pursuant to FRCP 60 -- Leave to File Reply Granted on December 23, 2008 filed by Connectu, Inc., Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss, Divya Narendra. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Margaret A. Esquenet, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B to Declaration, # 4 Exhibit C to Declaration)(Hornick, John)
December 23, 2008 246 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Daniel P. Tighe (Tighe, Daniel)
December 23, 2008 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Electronic ORDER entered granting 245 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Reply to Facebook's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanction of Non-Dismissal, or in the Alternative to Vacate Final Judgment Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 60 by Connectu, Inc., Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss, Divya Narendra; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Lovett, Jarrett)
December 23, 2008 245 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Reply to Facebook's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanction of Non-Dismissal, or in the Alternative to Vacate Final Judgment Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 60 by Connectu, Inc., Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss, Divya Narendra. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Reply to Defendants' Opposition, # 2 Exhibit Declaration of M. Esquenet, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Hornick, John)
December 23, 2008 244 Conditional Withdrawal of Representation of ConnectU, Inc. by Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss, Divya Narendra.(Hornick, John) Modified to term motion on 12/24/2008 (Seelye, Terri).
December 19, 2008 243 RESPONSE to Motion re 232 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Sutton, Theresa)
December 18, 2008 242 RESPONSE to Motion re 240 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Evan A. Parke filed by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Sutton, Theresa)
December 18, 2008 Filing fee/payment: $ 50., receipt number BST007844 for 240 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Evan A. Parke (Gawlik, Cathy)
December 17, 2008 241 DECLARATION re 240 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Evan A. Parke by Connectu, Inc.. (McConchie, Scott)
December 17, 2008 240 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Evan A. Parke by Connectu, Inc..(McConchie, Scott)
December 16, 2008 239 Sealed Document: Exhibit L to declaration of Evan Andrew Parke in support of motion. Related document 229 . (Seelye, Terri)
December 16, 2008 238 Sealed Document: Exhibit A to the declaration of Theresa A. Sutton in support of opposition. Related Document 223 . (Seelye, Terri)
December 16, 2008 237 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Connectu, Inc.. (Hornick, John)
December 16, 2008 236 NOTICE OF MANUAL FILING by Connectu, Inc. (Hornick, John)
December 16, 2008 235 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg re 224 Response to Motion, 225 Affidavit in Opposition (Oppo to Mtn for Sanctions). (Sutton, Theresa)
December 16, 2008 234 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg re 226 Notice (Other) (Ntc of Ord re 4th Mtn to Stay). (Sutton, Theresa)
December 16, 2008 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Electronic ORDER entered granting 230 Assented to Motion to Seal Exhibit L to the December 15, 2008 Declaration of Evan AndrewParke re 229 Memorandum in Support of Motion. (Lovett, Jarrett)
December 16, 2008 230 Assented to MOTION to Seal Document by Connectu, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hornick, John)
December 16, 2008 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Electronic ORDER entered granting 223 Assented to MOTION to Seal Exhibit A to Sutton Declaration in Support of Opposition to Motion for Sanctions. (Lovett, Jarrett)
December 15, 2008 233 MOTION to Dismiss with prejudice by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg, Eduardo Saverin. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-11923-DPW, 1:07-cv-10593-DPW(Seelye, Terri)
December 15, 2008 232 MOTION to Dismiss with prejudice all claims against The Facebook, Inc. and Mark Zuckerberg by Connectu, Inc., ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss.Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-11923-DPW, 1:07-cv-10593-DPW(Seelye, Terri)
December 15, 2008 231 NOTICE of Appearance by James P. Harrington on behalf of Special Master George C. Fisher to comply with order and judgment in action before the Honorable James Ware in US District Court for the Northern District of California ("California Action") involving claims in and parties to this action ("Massachusetts Action"). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Seelye, Terri)
December 15, 2008 229 MEMORANDUM in Support re 227 MOTION to Stay -- Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay Any Dismissal of Claims -- -- Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay Consideration of the Motions to Dismiss Pending Appeal to the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit filed by Connectu, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Evan Andrew Parke, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K)(Hornick, John)
December 15, 2008 228 NOTICE by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Facebook, Inc. Of Order Dismissing the Northern District of California Action (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Chatterjee, I.)
December 15, 2008 227 MOTION to Stay -- Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay Any Dismissal of Claims -- by Connectu, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hornick, John)
December 12, 2008 226 NOTICE by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg of Entry of Order Denying Motion for Stay of Execution (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Sutton, Theresa)
December 12, 2008 225 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re 224 Response to Motion,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Chatterjee, I.)
December 12, 2008 224 RESPONSE to Motion re 212 MOTION for Sanctions of non-dismissal or in the alternative to vacate final judgment pursuant to FRCP 60 filed by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Chatterjee, I.)
December 11, 2008 223 Assented to MOTION to Seal Exhibit A to Sutton declaration in support of opposition to motion for sanctions by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sutton, Theresa) Modified text on 12/12/2008 (Seelye, Terri).
November 26, 2008 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Electronic ORDER entered APPROVING 221 Stipulation regarding enlargement of time to respond; defendant's opposition to 212 Plaintiff's MOTION for Sanctions of Non-Dismissal or in the Alternative to Vacate Final Judgment Pursuant to FRCP 60 is due by 12/12/2008.(Lovett, Jarrett)
November 25, 2008 221 STIPULATION AND [PROP] ORDER ENLARGING TIME TO RESP TO PL'S MTN FOR SANCTIONS by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Sutton, Theresa)
November 24, 2008 220 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg re 211 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), 216 Notice (Other). (Sutton, Theresa)
November 24, 2008 219 Sealed Document: Memorandum in support of motion for sanction of non-dismissal, or in the alternative, to vacate final judgment. Related Document 212 . (Seelye, Terri)
November 24, 2008 218 Sealed Document: Exhibit A to declaration of Meredith H. Schoenfeld. Related Document 213 . (Seelye, Terri)
November 24, 2008 217 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Connectu, Inc. (Hornick, John) Related Documents [218, 219 . Modified text & created links on 11/24/2008 (Seelye, Terri).
November 21, 2008 216 NOTICE by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg OF COURT RULINGS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Sutton, Theresa)
November 21, 2008 215 NOTICE OF MANUAL FILING by Connectu, Inc. re 212 MOTION for Sanctions of non-dismissal or in the alternative to vacate final judgment pursuant to FRCP 60(Hornick, John) Modified text on 11/24/2008 (Seelye, Terri).
November 21, 2008 214 DECLARATION of John F. Hornick re 212 MOTION for Sanctions of non-dismissal or in the alternative to vacate final judgment pursuant to FRCP 60 by Connectu, Inc.. (Hornick, John) Modified text on 11/24/2008 (Seelye, Terri).
November 21, 2008 213 DECLARATION of Meredith H. Schoenfeld re 212 MOTION for Sanctions of non-dismissal or in the alternative to vacate final judgment pursuant to FRCP 60 by Connectu, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L)(Hornick, John) Modified text on 11/24/2008 (Seelye, Terri).
November 21, 2008 212 MOTION for Sanctions of non-dismissal or in the alternative to vacate final judgment pursuant to FRCP 60 by Connectu, Inc..(Hornick, John) Modified text on 11/24/2008 (Seelye, Terri).
November 21, 2008 211 NOTICE by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg OF COURT RULINGS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Sutton, Theresa)
November 21, 2008 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Electronic ORDER entered granting 210 Assented to MOTION to Seal Document by Connectu, Inc. (Lovett, Jarrett)
November 20, 2008 210 Assented to MOTION to Seal Document by Connectu, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hornick, John)
July 14, 2008 Case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings. (Dolan, Kathleen)
July 9, 2008 209 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg re 208 Notice (Other). (Sutton, Theresa)
July 8, 2008 208 NOTICE by Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg Notice of Entry of Judgment Enforcing Settlement Agreement (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Judgment Enforcing Settlement Agreement)(Sutton, Theresa)
June 26, 2008 207 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg re 206 Notice (Other), Notice (Other). (Sutton, Theresa)
June 26, 2008 206 NOTICE by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg re 191 Sealed Document Notice of Order Granting Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Sutton, Theresa)
June 11, 2008 Mailed Memorandum and Opinion and transcripts to the Honorable James Ware, San Jose California. Related Document 204 (Seelye, Terri)
June 4, 2008 204 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered directing that this Memorandum and any transcript that is prepared of the hearing before me be transmitted by the Clerk to Judge Ware, with any transcript of the in-camera portion of the hearing noted as being under seal in this Court in accordance with this Court's September 13, 2007 Order for Discovery of Computer Memory Devices.(Woodlock, Douglas)
June 2, 2008 205 EXHIBITS numbered 1 through 15 submitted by Jeffrey Parmet. (Seelye, Terri)FILED UNDER SEAL.
June 2, 2008 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Status Conference held on 6/2/2008: Parties address the issue of a discovery dispute regarding documents in connection with purported settlement and subject to a violation of a Court Order issued on 9/13/07 in open court; Court denies deft's request to dismiss this matter; En Camera hearing held with counsel for the deft's and for Jeff Parmet; Jeff Parmet is sworn and testifies; witness is found not in contempt; further hearing held in open court will all parties; Court informs all parties of said ruling; documents received by the Court; without objection, said documents will be maintained under seal, Court will not review the documents. An Order shall issue. (Court Reporter: Diane Molas)(Attorneys present: Hornick, Schoenfeld, Tighe, Underhill, Sutton, Oczek, Mosko, Jenkins, Hawk, Hampton, Chatterjee, Bauer, Gesmer, Sheehan) (Lovett, Jarrett)
June 2, 2008 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Electronic ORDER entered granting 202 Assented Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Added D. Michael Underhill for Connectu, Inc. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Forms and then scroll down to CM/ECF Forms. (Lovett, Jarrett)
June 2, 2008 Filing fee/payment: $ 50.00, receipt number BST003888 for 202 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Michael D. Underhill (Russo, Patricia)
June 2, 2008 203 AFFIDAVIT of D. Michael Underhill re 202 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Michael D. Underhill by Connectu, Inc.. (McConchie, Scott)
June 2, 2008 202 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Michael D. Underhill by Connectu, Inc..(McConchie, Scott)
May 30, 2008 199 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg re 197 Notice (Other), 198 Notice (Other) OF CONFIDENTIAL UNDER SEAL DOCUMENTS. (Sutton, Theresa)
May 29, 2008 201 MOTION to conduct Hearing re 195 , 200 by Facebook, Inc. defendants.(Seelye, Terri)COMPLETE DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL IN CLERK'S OFFICE.
May 29, 2008 200 Opposition re 195 to Connectu, Inc.'s SEALED EMERGENCY MOTION for expedited hearing and in camera examination of documents and of the expert Parmet, in regard to 9/13/07 order filed by Facebook, Inc. (Seelye, Terri) COMPLETE DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL IN CLERK'S OFFICE.
May 29, 2008 198 NOTICE by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg NOTICE OF MANUAL FILING WITH CLERKS OFFICE (Oczek, Jeremy)
May 29, 2008 197 NOTICE by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg Notice of Filing with The Clerk's Office (Sutton, Theresa)
May 28, 2008 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Electronic ORDER entered granting 196 Assented to MOTION to Seal by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Lovett, Jarrett)
May 28, 2008 196 Assented to MOTION to Seal by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sutton, Theresa)
May 22, 2008 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Electronic ORDER entered. Responses to 195 SEALED EMERGENCY MOTION for expedited hearing and in camera examination of documents and of the expert Parmet, in regard to 9/13/07 order filed by Connectu, Inc. are hereby due no later than 12:00 PM on 5/29/2008. A hearing as to this Motion is set for 6/2/2008 02:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. Jeff Parmet and his attorney are hereby Order to attend said hearing.(Lovett, Jarrett)
May 20, 2008 195 SEALED EMERGENCY MOTION for expedited hearing and in camera examination of documents and of the expert Parmet, in regard to 9/13/07 order filed by Connectu, Inc.(Attachments: # 1 Declaration of John F. Hornick, # 2 Declaration of Meredith H. Schoenfeld)(Seelye, Terri)
May 20, 2008 194 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Connectu, Inc.. (Hornick, John)
May 20, 2008 193 NOTICE by Connectu, Inc. of manual filing of documents with Clerk's office. (Hornick, John) Modified text on 5/22/2008 (Seelye, Terri).
May 20, 2008 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Electronic ORDER entered granting 192 Assented to MOTION to Seal Document by Connectu, Inc. (Lovett, Jarrett)
May 20, 2008 192 Assented to MOTION to Seal Document by Connectu, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hornick, John)
April 28, 2008 191 Notice of filing of motion. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Confidential Motion)Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-10593-DPW, 1:04-cv-11923-DPW.(Seelye, Terri) FILED UNDER SEAL.
April 25, 2008 190 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER entered granting 188 Motion to Seal Document. (Seelye, Terri)
April 24, 2008 189 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg re Confidential Notice of Filing of Motion (Under Seal). (Sutton, Theresa) Related document 188 . Modified to create link on 4/28/2008 (Seelye, Terri).
April 24, 2008 188 MOTION to Seal Document by Dustin Moskovitz, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg, Eduardo Saverin. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sutton, Theresa)
April 23, 2008 187 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Connectu, Inc. re 186 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance. (Wolfson, Adam)
April 23, 2008 186 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Adam Wolfson and Quinn Emanuel Urquhart Oliver & Hedges, LLP (Wolfson, Adam)
April 23, 2008 185 NOTICE by Connectu, Inc. of Attorneys' Lien (Wolfson, Adam) Modified text on 4/24/2008 (Seelye, Terri).
April 7, 2008 184 NOTICE of documents to be filed under seal by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Thefacebook LLC, Connectu, Inc., Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Sutton, Theresa) Modified text on 4/8/2008 (Seelye, Terri).
April 1, 2008 183 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL:Electronic NOTICE re: sealed documents: pursuant to Magistrate Judge Collings' Order of 3/27/08 granting Motions 66, 69, 73, 80, 81 and 82 in the above-captioned matter, counsel shall designate the specific documents to be sealed by DOCKET NUMBER AND/OR EXHIBIT NUMBER on or before 4/7/08. (Dolan, Kathleen)
March 31, 2008 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Electronic ORDER entered terminating 30 Motion to Dismiss; terminating 83 Motion to Dismiss; terminating 84 Motion to Strike ; terminating 85 Motion for Summary Judgment; terminating 87 Motion to Dismiss; terminating 89 Motion to Dismiss; terminating 91 Motion to Dismiss; terminating 16 Motion to Dismiss; terminating 17 Motion to Dismiss; terminating 176 Motion for Summary Judgment; terminating 181 Sealed Motion; terminating 182 Motion for Extension of Time (Lovett, Jarrett)
March 27, 2008 Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings: Electronic ORDER entered granting Motions to seal 66 , 69 , 73 , 80 , 81 , 82 . Modified text on 3/28/2008 (Seelye, Terri).
February 20, 2008 Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings: Electronic ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part 132 Motion to Compel. In the exercise of the Court's discretion, it is ORDERED that plaintiff's expert, at the Facebook Defendants' expense, image and search for computer program source code files and database definitions on the ten computer storage devices listed in Attorney Wolfson's letter on November 30, 2007 165 . More specifically, the motion to compel Request #117 is ALLOWED except that the motion is DENIED as to that part of Request #117 which reads: "...or any software reflecting the creation, development and operation of the ConnectU website, the Social Butterfly Program, or the Facebook Importer program." Counsel shall submit to the Court, on or before the close of business on March 4, 2008, a form of Order to be entered by the Court which is agreeable to all parties and which shall set forth the protocols to be used in the imaging and searching. The Order shall set a date by which plaintiff's must supplement their response to Request 1 and produce any material not previously produced which is discovered as a result of the imaging and searching. The motion to compel as to Requests #2 and ##67-68 is DENIED. See Rule 26(b(2)(C), Fed. R. Civ. P.
February 15, 2008 182 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to March 10, 2008 to To File Oppositions to the Parties' Pending Motion for Summary Judgment by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Monte)
February 13, 2008 181 SEALED MOTION (Notice of) and memorandum of law to file supplemental authority in opposition to defendants' motion for summary judgment and renewed Rule 56(F) motion by Connectu, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibits A thru F)(Seelye, Terri)
February 13, 2008 180 NOTICE by Connectu, Inc. of Filing With Clerk's Office (Tighe, Daniel)
February 13, 2008 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Electronic ORDER entered granting 175 Motion for leave to File Under Seal (Lovett, Jarrett)
February 12, 2008 179 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re 176 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Claim of Copyright Infringement filed by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Chatterjee, I.)
February 12, 2008 178 DECLARATION re 177 Memorandum in Support of 176 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Claim of Copyright Infringement by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13)(Chatterjee, I.) Modified text on 2/13/2008 (Seelye, Terri).
February 12, 2008 177 MEMORANDUM in Support re 176 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Claim of Copyright Infringement filed by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Chatterjee, I.)
February 12, 2008 176 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Claim of Copyright Infringement by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chatterjee, I.)
February 8, 2008 175 MOTION to Seal or file under Seal: (I) Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Memorandum of Law to File Supplemental Authority in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; and (II) Renewed Rule 56(F) Motion by Connectu, Inc..(Tighe, Daniel)
February 4, 2008 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Electronic ORDER entered granting 173 , 174 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Added David E. Azar for plaintiff Connectu, Inc. and Sean A. Lincoln for defendants Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc. and Mark Zuckerberg. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Forms and then scroll down to CM/ECF Forms. (Seelye, Terri)
January 29, 2008 174 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of David E. Azar Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 01010000000001829904. by Connectu, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of David Azar )(Wolfson, Adam) Modified text on 2/4/2008 (Seelye, Terri).
January 28, 2008 173 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Sean A. Lincoln Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 01010000000001827994. by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Sean A. Lincoln)(Oczek, Jeremy)
January 7, 2008 172 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on November 19, 2007 before Judge Collings. Digital Recording: Transcribed by Maryann Young. The original transcripts are maintained by the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting Maryann Young at 508/384-2003 or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah)
December 7, 2007 171 Response by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg to 167 Response to Motion to Unseal. (Chatterjee, I.)
December 4, 2007 170 DECLARATION OF LUKE O'BRIEN by 02138. (Ritvo, Elizabeth)
December 4, 2007 169 DECLARATION OF BOM KIM by 02138. (Ritvo, Elizabeth)
December 4, 2007 168 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on November 30, 2007 before Judge Woodlock. Court Reporter: Brenda K. Hancock. The original transcripts are maintained by the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter at 617/439-3214 or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah)
November 30, 2007 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Motion Hearing held on 11/30/2007 re (305) SEALED Motion for Temporary Restraining Order in case # 1:04-cv-11923-DPW, and (162) SEALED Motion for Temporary Restraining Order in case # 1:07-cv-10593-DPW: Parties inform the Court of discovery leading up to todays hearing; Court will allow a proposed plan for discovery; O'Brien and representative of magazine are to file declarations by 12/4/07; parties inform the Court of preliminary plans for discovery; Court recesses to allow the parties to consult with their clients; Court resumes; atty Balin reports that some of the documents at issue were received from the Clerks Office of the Court of Appeals; 02138 states that redactions as to the deposition transcript will be made; the cash flow document does not disclose much; 02138 has additional documents in it's possession; after oral arguments of the parties; the Court DENIES (162) Motion for TRO in case 1:07-cv-10593-DPW; and DENIES (305) Motion for TRO in case 1:04-cv-11923-DPW treated as a preliminary injunction as stated and recorded in the stenogropher's notes. Facebook is to file a response as to 02138's request to unseal submissions by 12/7/07; the parties proposals as to discovery are due by 12/7/07 if necessary. (Court Reporter: Brenda Hancock)(Attorneys present: Tighe, Hornick, Schoenfeld, Calamari, Wolfson, Esquenet, Hart, Bea, Chatterjee, Bauer, Batten, Hampton, Hawk, Shafroth, Pulgram, Ritvo, Balin, Handman, Husbanda) Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-10593-DPW, 1:04-cv-11923-DPW(Lovett, Jarrett)
November 30, 2007 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Electronic ORDER entered granting 164 Assented Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Added Laurence F. Pulgram for Mark Zuckerberg: Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Forms and then scroll down to CM/ECF Forms. (Lovett, Jarrett)
November 30, 2007 166 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Connectu, Inc. re 165 Notice (Other). (Wolfson, Adam)
November 30, 2007 165 NOTICE by Facebook, Inc. re 137 Opposition to Motion Letter from Adam Wolfson to Judge Collings (Wolfson, Adam)
November 30, 2007 164 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Laurence F. Pulgram Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1761710. by Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Laurence F. Pulgram)(Oczek, Jeremy)
November 29, 2007 167 RESPONSE to Motion re 162 SEALED MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed UNDER SEAL by 02138. (Hurley, Virginia)
November 29, 2007 163 STATUS REPORT on Discovery by Eduardo Saverin. (Hampton, Daniel)
November 29, 2007 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 162 SEALED MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order : Motion Hearing set for 11/30/2007 12:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. (Lovett, Jarrett)
November 29, 2007 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Electronic ORDER entered granting 161 Assented to MOTION to Seal Documents (Lovett, Jarrett)
November 29, 2007 162 SEALED MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg, Eduardo Saverin. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration# 2 Exhibit # 3 Exhibit # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Nici, Richard)
November 29, 2007 161 Assented to MOTION to Seal Documents by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg.(Bauer, Steven)
November 19, 2007 160 REPLY to Response to Motion re 148 filed by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Cooper, Monte) Modified on 11/21/2007 (Nici, Richard).
November 19, 2007 159 REPLY to Response to Motion re 132 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Image and Search Their Memory Devices For Source Code, And To Comply with Requests for Production Nos. 102, 67-68 and 117 filed by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Sutton, Theresa)
November 19, 2007 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff: 11/19/07 Motion Hearing clerknote edited to change typo re deadline for Plaintiff to file statement - statement due 11/30/07. (Russo, Noreen)
November 19, 2007 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Robert B. Collings: Motion Hearing held on 11/19/2007 re: 132 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Image and Search Their Memory Devices For Source Code, And To Comply with Requests for Production Nos. 102, 67-68 and 117 filed by Mark Zuckerberg, Andrew McCollum, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Dustin Moskovitz, and 146 MOTION to Compel Response to Interrogatory No. 1 filed by Mark Zuckerberg, Andrew McCollum, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Christopher Hughes, Dustin Moskovitz. Court takes 132 under advisement; plaintiffs to file a statement on or before cob 11/30/2007 as to how many memory devices would have to be imaged if the motion were allowed. Court rules on 146 .(Digital Recording) Modified on 11/19/2007 (Russo, Noreen).
November 19, 2007 Judge Robert B. Collings: Electronic ORDER entered granting 134 Motion to Seal; granting 156 Motion for Leave to File (Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document); granting 146 The Facebook Defendants' Motion to Compel Response to Interrogatory No. 1. The plaintiffs are ORDERED to serve a full and complete answer to Interrogatory #1 from all sources of information within their possession, custody and/or control on or before the close of business on Tuesday, January 15, 2008.
November 16, 2007 158 Supplemental Response by Facebook, Inc. to 102 Order re Location of Relevant Code. (Sutton, Theresa)
November 16, 2007 157 DECLARATION re 156 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Facebook Defendants' Motion to Compel Response to Interrogatory No. 1 by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 18# 2 Exhibit 19# 3 Exhibit 20# 4 Exhibit 21# 5 Exhibit 22# 6 Exhibit 23# 7 Exhibit 24# 8 Exhibit 25)(Cooper, Monte)
November 16, 2007 156 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Facebook Defendants' Motion to Compel Response to Interrogatory No. 1 by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Reply# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Monte)
November 16, 2007 155 DECLARATION re 150 Declaration,,, re De-Designation of Exhibit 34 by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 # 2)(Sutton, Theresa)
November 16, 2007 154 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Connectu, Inc. re 152 Declaration, 151 Response to Motion, 153 Response to Motion,. (Wolfson, Adam)
November 16, 2007 153 RESPONSE to Motion re 146 MOTION to Compel Response to Interrogatory No. 1 Corrected Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to the Facebook Defendants' Motion to Compel Response to Interrogatory No. 1 filed by Connectu, Inc.. (Wolfson, Adam)
November 16, 2007 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 146 MOTION to Compel Response to Interrogatory No. 1 : Motion Hearing set for 11/19/2007 @ 11:00 AM in Courtroom 23 before Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings. (Russo, Noreen)
November 15, 2007 Judge Robert B. Collings : Electronic ORDER entered granting 144 Motion to Seal; and granting 149 Motion for Leave to File; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Dolan, Kathleen)
November 15, 2007 152 DECLARATION re 151 Response to Motion Declaration of Adam Wolfson in Support of Plaintiffs' Memo in Opposition to the Defendants' Motion to Compel Response to Interrogatory No. 1 by Connectu, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Wolfson, Adam)
November 15, 2007 151 RESPONSE to Motion re 146 MOTION to Compel Response to Interrogatory No. 1 filed by Connectu, Inc.. (Wolfson, Adam)
November 14, 2007 150 DECLARATION re 149 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File The Facebook Defendants' Memorandum In Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition [Dkt 137] to Defendants' Motion to Compel Plaintiffs to Image and Search Their Memory Devices for Source Code, and To Comply wiAssented to MOTION for Leave to File The Facebook Defendants' Memorandum In Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition [Dkt 137] to Defendants' Motion to Compel Plaintiffs to Image and Search Their Memory Devices for Source Code, and To Comply wi by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 26# 2 Exhibit 27# 3 Exhibit 28# 4 Exhibit 29# 5 Exhibit 30# 6 Exhibit 31# 7 Exhibit 32# 8 Exhibit 33# 9 Exhibit 34# 10 Exhibit 35# 11 Exhibit 36)(Sutton, Theresa) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/20/2007 (Nici, Richard).
November 14, 2007 149 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File The Facebook Defendants' Memorandum In Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition [Dkt 137] to Defendants' Motion to Compel Plaintiffs to Image and Search Their Memory Devices for Source Code, and To Comply with Requests for Production Nos. 1-2, 67-68, and 117 by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Reply)# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sutton, Theresa)
November 14, 2007 148 AFFIDAVIT of Monte M.F. Cooper in Support re 146 MOTION to Compel Response to Interrogatory No. 1 filed by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8# 9 Exhibit 9# 10 Exhibit 10# 11 Exhibit 11# 12 Exhibit 12# 13 Exhibit 13# 14 Exhibit 14# 15 Exhibit 15# 16 Exhibit 16# 17 Exhibit 17)(Cooper, Monte)
November 14, 2007 147 MEMORANDUM in Support re 146 MOTION to Compel Response to Interrogatory No. 1 filed by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Cooper, Monte)
November 14, 2007 146 MOTION to Compel Response to Interrogatory No. 1 by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Monte)
November 14, 2007 145 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg re 144 Assented to MOTION to Seal Under Seal Exhibits 31 and 34 to The Declaration of Theresa Sutton. (Sutton, Theresa)
November 14, 2007 144 Assented to MOTION to Seal by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sutton, Theresa)
November 8, 2007 143 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on October 17, 2007 before Judge Woodlock. Court Reporter: Marcia G. Patrisso. The original transcripts are maintained by the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter at 617/737-8728 or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah)
November 8, 2007 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 132 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Image and Search Their Memory Devices For Source Code, And To Comply with Requests for Production Nos. 102, 67-68 and 117 : Motion Hearing set for 11/19/2007 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 23 before Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings. (Dolan, Kathleen)
November 7, 2007 142 DECLARATION of Tyler Winklevoss by Connectu, Inc.. (Tighe, Daniel)
November 7, 2007 141 DECLARATION of Howard Winklevoss by Connectu, Inc.. (Tighe, Daniel)
November 7, 2007 140 DECLARATION of Cameron Winklevoss by Connectu, Inc.. (Tighe, Daniel)
November 7, 2007 139 DECLARATION of Divya Narendra by Connectu, Inc.. (Tighe, Daniel)
November 7, 2007 138 DECLARATION of Adam B. Wolfson by Connectu, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1)(Tighe, Daniel)
November 7, 2007 137 Opposition re 132 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Image and Search Their Memory Devices For Source Code, And To Comply with Requests for Production Nos. 102, 67-68 and 117 filed by Connectu, Inc.. (Tighe, Daniel)
October 24, 2007 136 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg re 133 Memorandum in Support of Motion, and Under Seal Exhibits to the Declaration of Monte Cooper in Support Thereof. (Sutton, Theresa)
October 24, 2007 135 DECLARATION re 132 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Image and Search Their Memory Devices For Source Code, And To Comply with Requests for Production Nos. 102, 67-68 and 117 by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1A# 2 Exhibit 1B# 3 Exhibit 2# 4 Exhibit 3, 4, 20, 21, and 22 (UNDER SEAL)# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8# 9 Exhibit 9# 10 Exhibit 10# 11 Exhibit 11# 12 Exhibit 12# 13 Exhibit 13# 14 Exhibit 14# 15 Exhibit 15# 16 Exhibit 16# 17 Exhibit 17# 18 Exhibit 18A# 19 Exhibit 18B# 20 Exhibit 18C# 21 Exhibit 19A# 22 Exhibit 19B# 23 Exhibit 23# 24 Exhibit 24# 25 Exhibit 25)(Sutton, Theresa) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/26/2007 (Nici, Richard).
October 24, 2007 134 Assented to MOTION to Seal Memorandum In Support of Motion to Compel and Certain Exhibits to the Declaration of Monte Cooper by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sutton, Theresa)
October 24, 2007 132 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Image and Search Their Memory Devices For Source Code, And To Comply with Requests for Production Nos. 102, 67-68 and 117 by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sutton, Theresa)
October 17, 2007 Motions Taken Under Advisement: 16 MOTION to Dismiss, 87 MOTION to Dismiss, 91 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(B)(6), 85 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Claims for Breach of Contract, Breach of the Covenant of Good Faith and Fair Dealing, and Promissory Estoppel, 89 MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FED.R.CIV.P. 12(B)(6), 17 MOTION to Dismiss, 83 MOTION to Dismiss, 30 MOTION to Dismiss, 84 MOTION to Strike Demands in Prayer For Relief in First Amended Complaint (Lovett, Jarrett)
October 17, 2007 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Motion Hearing held on 10/17/2007 re 82 MOTION to Seal Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Defendants' Motion to Strike Demands filed by Mark Zuckerberg, Andrew McCollum, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Christopher Hughes, Dustin Moskovitz, 66 Assented to MOTION to Seal Document Assented-To Motion to Seal Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint and Exhibits to the Declaration of Meredith H. Schoenfeld filed by Connectu, Inc., 16 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., 91 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(B)(6) filed by Andrew McCollum, Dustin Moskovitz, 69 Assented to MOTION to Seal Document --Exhibit to the Declaration of Meredith H. Schoenfeld filed by Connectu, Inc., 89 MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FED.R.CIV.P. 12(B)(6) filed by Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., 17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Dustin Moskovitz, 83 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Mark Zuckerberg, 81 MOTION to Seal Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, and Exhibit 5 to the Declaration of Monte Cooper ISO Same filed by Mark Zuckerberg, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., 30 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Eduardo Saverin, 84 MOTION to Strike Demands in Prayer For Relief in First Amended Complaint filed by Mark Zuckerberg, Andrew McCollum, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Dustin Moskovitz, 87 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Eduardo Saverin, 85 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Claims for Breach of Contract, Breach of the Covenant of Good Faith and Fair Dealing, and Promissory Estoppel filed by Mark Zuckerberg, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., 80 MOTION to Seal Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Mark Zuckerberg's Motion to Dismiss filed by Mark Zuckerberg, 73 Assented to MOTION to Seal --ASSENTED-TO MOTION TO SEAL PLAINTIFFS' EXHIBITS TO SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF MEREDITH H. SHOENFELD filed by Connectu, Inc.: Atty's Werder, Tighe and Wolfson for Connectu, Inc.; Atty's Chatterjee, Cooper, Bauer, Guy and Sutton for Facebook, Inc.; Atty Hampton for Eduardo Saverin; Saverin has not satisfied discovery obligations; Cour Orders Saverin to comply with discovery; Facebook near completion of document production; Court Orders document production as to Saverin to be completed within 2 weeks; pltff does not object to sealing of source code and financial materials; after oral arguments of both sides Court reserves ruling on motions to seal and takes dispositive motions under advisement. (Court Reporter Marcia Patrisso.) (Lovett, Jarrett)
October 5, 2007 131 REPLY to Response to Motion re 91 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(B)(6) filed by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum. (Chatterjee, I.)
October 5, 2007 130 REPLY to Response to Motion re 89 MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FED.R.CIV.P. 12(B)(6) filed by Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc.. (Chatterjee, I.)
October 5, 2007 129 REPLY to Response to Motion re 84 MOTION to Strike Demands in Prayer For Relief in First Amended Complaint filed by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Chatterjee, I.)
October 5, 2007 128 REPLY to Response to Motion re 83 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Mark Zuckerberg. (Chatterjee, I.)
October 5, 2007 127 DECLARATION re 126 Reply to Response to Motion, by Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 6)(Chatterjee, I.)
October 5, 2007 126 REPLY to Response to Motion re 85 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Claims for Breach of Contract, Breach of the Covenant of Good Faith and Fair Dealing, and Promissory Estoppel filed by Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Chatterjee, I.)
October 5, 2007 125 REPLY to Response to Motion re 87 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Eduardo Saverin. (Shafroth, Nathan)
October 5, 2007 124 DECLARATION re 111 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1, Declaration of Anastasia Fernands in Support of Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by Connectu, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of A. Fernands Exhibit 1)(Fernands, Anastasia)
September 26, 2007 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Electronic ORDER entered granting 105 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Renee Bea for Connectu, Inc., Peter E. Calamari for Connectu, Inc., Sarah Hartley for Connectu, Inc., Richard Werder for Connectu, Inc., Adam Wolfson for Connectu, Inc. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Forms and then scroll down to CM/ECF Forms. (Nici, Richard)
September 24, 2007 123 Facebook Defendants' Response to Court's September 13, 2007 Order Regarding Location of Relevant Code Response by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Chatterjee, I.)
September 24, 2007 Filing fee: $ 250.00, receipt number 82520 for 105 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Renee Bea, Peter Calamari, Sarah Hartley, Rick Werder and Adam Wolfson (Diskes, Sheila) Modified on 9/25/2007 (Diskes, Sheila).
September 24, 2007 ELECTRONIC NOTICE issued requesting courtesy copy of Exhibits Attached to Docket No. 117. Counsel who filed this document are requested to submit a courtesy copy of these attachments to the Clerk's Office as soon as possible. These documents must be clearly marked as a Courtesy Copy for Magistrate Judge Collings and reflect the document number (#117) assigned by CM/ECF. (Dolan, Kathleen)
September 21, 2007 122 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Facebook, Inc.. Document received: Proposed Order Sealing Certain Portions of Connectu's First Amended Complaint, Certain Exhibits of the Declaration of Meredith Schoenfeld In Support Thereof, and Defendants' Motion to Strike Demands in Prayer for Relief. (Sutton, Theresa)
September 21, 2007 121 DECLARATION of Jennifer S. Muller by Facebook, Inc.. (Sutton, Theresa)
September 21, 2007 120 DECLARATION Of Owen Van Natta by Facebook, Inc.. (Sutton, Theresa)
September 21, 2007 119 DECLARATION re 117 Response to Order to Show Cause Declaration of Mark Zuckerberg by Facebook, Inc.. (Sutton, Theresa)
September 21, 2007 118 DECLARATION re 117 Response to Order to Show Cause Declaration of Michael Trinh by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 # 3 Exhibit 3)(Sutton, Theresa)
September 21, 2007 117 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Part 1# 2 Exhibit A, Part 2# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit D)(Sutton, Theresa)
September 21, 2007 116 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Connectu, Inc. re 113 Declaration, 115 Declaration, 114 Declaration, 112 Response to Motion,,,. (Fernands, Anastasia)
September 21, 2007 115 DECLARATION of CAMERON WINKLEVOSS 112 Response to Motion,,, by Connectu, Inc.. (Fernands, Anastasia) Modified on 10/5/2007 (Nici, Richard).
September 21, 2007 114 DECLARATION of DIVYA NARENDRA 112 Response to Motion,,, by Connectu, Inc.. (Fernands, Anastasia) Modified on 10/5/2007 (Nici, Richard).
September 21, 2007 113 DECLARATION OF VICTOR GAO 112 Response to Motion,,, by Connectu, Inc.. (Fernands, Anastasia) Modified on 10/5/2007 (Nici, Richard).
September 21, 2007 112 RESPONSE to Motion re 82 MOTION to Seal Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Defendants' Motion to Strike Demands, 91 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(B)(6), 89 MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FED.R.CIV.P. 12(B)(6), 83 MOTION to Dismiss, 81 MOTION to Seal Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, and Exhibit 5 to the Declaration of Monte Cooper ISO Same, 84 MOTION to Strike Demands in Prayer For Relief in First Amended Complaint, 85 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Claims for Breach of Contract, Breach of the Covenant of Good Faith and Fair Dealing, and Promissory Estoppel, 80 MOTION to Seal Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Mark Zuckerberg's Motion to Dismiss filed by Connectu, Inc.. (Fernands, Anastasia)
September 21, 2007 111 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re 81 MOTION to Seal Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, and Exhibit 5 to the Declaration of Monte Cooper ISO Same, 85 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Claims for Breach of Contract, Breach of the Covenant of Good Faith and Fair Dealing, and Promissory Estoppel filed by Connectu, Inc.. (Fernands, Anastasia)
September 21, 2007 110 Opposition re 87 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Connectu, Inc.. (Fernands, Anastasia)
September 21, 2007 109 DECLARATION re 108 Response to Motion,,, by Connectu, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Fernands, Anastasia)
September 21, 2007 108 RESPONSE to Motion re 82 MOTION to Seal Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Defendants' Motion to Strike Demands, 66 Assented to MOTION to Seal Document Assented-To Motion to Seal Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint and Exhibits to the Declaration of Meredith H. Schoenfeld, 69 Assented to MOTION to Seal Document --Exhibit to the Declaration of Meredith H. Schoenfeld, 81 MOTION to Seal Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, and Exhibit 5 to the Declaration of Monte Cooper ISO Same, 80 MOTION to Seal Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Mark Zuckerberg's Motion to Dismiss, 73 Assented to MOTION to Seal --ASSENTED-TO MOTION TO SEAL PLAINTIFFS' EXHIBITS TO SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF MEREDITH H. SHOENFELD filed by Connectu, Inc.. (Fernands, Anastasia)
September 21, 2007 107 MEMORANDUM in Support re 83 MOTION to Dismiss FILED UNDER SEAL filed by Mark Zuckerberg. (Chatterjee, I.) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/21/2007 (Nici, Richard).
September 21, 2007 106 MEMORANDUM in Support re 85 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Claims for Breach of Contract, Breach of the Covenant of Good Faith and Fair Dealing, and Promissory Estoppel filed by Mark Zuckerberg.FILED UNDER SEAL (Nici, Richard) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/21/2007 (Nici, Richard). Additional attachment(s) added on 9/21/2007 (Nici, Richard).
September 19, 2007 105 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Renee Bea, Peter Calamari, Sarah Hartley, Rick Werder and Adam Wolfson by Connectu, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(McConchie, Scott)
September 19, 2007 104 NOTICE of Appearance by Anastasia M. Fernands on behalf of Connectu, Inc. (Fernands, Anastasia)
September 13, 2007 103 Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings: ORDER entered. ORDER FOR DISCOVERY OF COMPUTER MEMORY DEVICES.(Russo, Noreen)
September 13, 2007 102 Judge Robert B. Collings : ORDER ON REMAINING DISPUTED DISCOVERY ITEMS OUTLINED IN THE CORRECTED AMENDED JOINT REPORT, ETC. (#94) entered. (Dolan, Kathleen)
September 13, 2007 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Robert B. Collings: Hearing re: disputed issues delineated in 94 held on 9/13/2007. After hearing, taken under advisement. (Digital Recording: 11:38:33-12:02:15)
September 10, 2007 101 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on July 25, 2007 before Judge Woodlock. Court Reporter: Marie L. Cloonan. The original transcripts are maintained by the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter at 617/439-7086 or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah)
September 5, 2007 Motions terminated: 18 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Mark Zuckerberg. (Nici, Richard)
September 5, 2007 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 17 MOTION to Dismiss, 18 MOTION to Dismiss, 81 MOTION to Seal Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, and Exhibit 5 to the Declaration of Monte Cooper ISO Same, 69 Assented to MOTION to Seal Document --Exhibit to the Declaration of Meredith H. Schoenfeld, 83 MOTION to Dismiss, 84 MOTION to Strike Demands in Prayer For Relief in First Amended Complaint, 87 MOTION to Dismiss, 85 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Claims for Breach of Contract, Breach of the Covenant of Good Faith and Fair Dealing, and Promissory Estoppel, 89 MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FED.R.CIV.P. 12(B)(6), 80 MOTION to Seal Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Mark Zuckerberg's Motion to Dismiss, 16 MOTION to Dismiss, 82 MOTION to Seal Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Defendants' Motion to Strike Demands, 73 Assented to MOTION to Seal --ASSENTED-TO MOTION TO SEAL PLAINTIFFS' EXHIBITS TO SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF MEREDITH H. SHOENFELD, 66 Assented to MOTION to Seal Document Assented-To Motion to Seal Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint and Exhibits to the Declaration of Meredith H. Schoenfeld, 30 MOTION to Dismiss, 91 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(B)(6) : Motion Hearing set for 10/17/2007 02:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. (Lovett, Jarrett)
September 5, 2007 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Electronic ORDER entered as to 82 MOTION to Seal Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Defendants' Motion to Strike Demands, 73 Assented to MOTION to Seal --ASSENTED-TO MOTION TO SEAL PLAINTIFFS' EXHIBITS TO SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF MEREDITH H. SHOENFELD, 69 Assented to MOTION to Seal Document --Exhibit to the Declaration of Meredith H. Schoenfeld, 81 MOTION to Seal Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, and Exhibit 5 to the Declaration of Monte Cooper ISO Same, 66 Assented to MOTION to Seal Document Assented-To Motion to Seal Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint and Exhibits to the Declaration of Meredith H. Schoenfeld, 80 MOTION to Seal Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Mark Zuckerberg's Motion to Dismiss: The parties are to show cause on or before September 21, 2007, if any there be apart from the disposition of the parties to assent as being within the protective order, why the motions to seal ( Nos. 66, 69, 73, 80, 81, 82) should be allowed. Ant further responsive submissions may be filed on or before October 5, 2007. (Lovett, Jarrett)
September 5, 2007 100 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : ORDER entered re: Extension of Time as to 87 MOTION to Dismiss, 91 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(B)(6), 84 MOTION to Strike Demands in Prayer For Relief in First Amended Complaint, 83 MOTION to Dismiss, 89 MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FED.R.CIV.P. 12(B)(6), 85 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Claims for Breach of Contract, Breach of the Covenant of Good Faith and Fair Dealing, and Promissory Estoppel: This Court grants Plaintiffs an extension of time to September 21, 2007 to opposeDefendants motions to dismiss, motion to strike, and motion for summary judgment filed on August 29, 2007 (Dkt. 83, 84, 85, 87,89, 91). This Court further grants Defendants an extension of time to October 5, 2007 to reply to Plaintiffs oppositions.(Lovett, Jarrett)
September 5, 2007 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF HEARING: Hearing set for 9/13/2007 at 11:30 AM at Courtroom #23, John Joseph Moakley United States Courthouse, Boston, Massachusetts before Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings on all disputes set forth in the Corrected Amended Joint Report, Etc. (#94) filed August 29, 2007.
September 2, 2007 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Electronic ORDER entered granting 96 Motion for Extension of Time; denying 97 Motion for modification of briefing schedule regarding summary judgment motions, except that the summary judgment briefing schedule shall be extended in accordance with the briefing schedule for the motions to dismiss extended through the grant of 96 , the question of summary judgment on contract-like claims being especially conducive to effective opposition, if well founded, by the opposing minds said to have met, who should be well positioned to identify - without further discovery - the existence of any genuine issues of material fact regarding such claims. (Woodlock, Douglas)
August 30, 2007 97 MOTION for Summary Judgment Scheduling Conference, or Alternatively, for a Scheduling Order by Connectu, Inc..(Hornick, John)
August 30, 2007 96 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to September 21, 2007 to File Oppositions to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss and Motion to Strike -- and Joint Motion for Extension of Time to October 5, 2007 for Defendants to Reply to Plaintiffs' Oppositions by Connectu, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hornick, John)
August 29, 2007 99 Memorandum in Support re 82 & 84 Defendant's motion to strike demands in prayer for relief (Nici, Richard)
August 29, 2007 98 Memorandum of Points in support re 85 Defendant's motion for Summary Judgment. FILED UNDER SEAL (Nici, Richard)
August 29, 2007 95 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg Of Confidential Under Seal Documents. (Chatterjee, I.)
August 29, 2007 94 STATUS REPORT CORRECTED AMENDED JOINT REPORT PURSUANT TO JUDGE COLLINGSS by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Thefacebook LLC, Connectu, Inc., Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Chatterjee, I.)
August 29, 2007 93 MEMORANDUM in Support re 91 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(B)(6) filed by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Chatterjee, I.)
August 29, 2007 92 APPENDIX/EXHIBIT re 85 83 89 91 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Claims for Breach of Contract, Breach of the Covenant of Good Faith and Fair Dealing, and Promissory Estoppel by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A and B)(Chatterjee, I.) Modified on 9/4/2007 (Nici, Richard). Modified on 9/4/2007 (Nici, Richard).
August 29, 2007 91 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(B)(6) by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss)(Chatterjee, I.)
August 29, 2007 90 MEMORANDUM in Support re 89 MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FED.R.CIV.P. 12(B)(6) filed by Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc.. (Chatterjee, I.)
August 29, 2007 89 MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FED.R.CIV.P. 12(B)(6) by Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss)(Chatterjee, I.)
August 29, 2007 88 MEMORANDUM in Support re 87 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Eduardo Saverin. (Hampton, Daniel)
August 29, 2007 87 MOTION to Dismiss by Eduardo Saverin.(Hampton, Daniel)
August 29, 2007 86 DECLARATION re 85 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Claims for Breach of Contract, Breach of the Covenant of Good Faith and Fair Dealing, and Promissory Estoppel by Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5 - Notice of Manual Filing)(Chatterjee, I.)
August 29, 2007 85 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Claims for Breach of Contract, Breach of the Covenant of Good Faith and Fair Dealing, and Promissory Estoppel by Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for SJ)(Chatterjee, I.) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/4/2007 (Nici, Richard).
August 29, 2007 84 MOTION to Strike Demands in Prayer For Relief in First Amended Complaint by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Strike)(Chatterjee, I.)
August 29, 2007 83 MOTION to Dismiss by Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss)(Chatterjee, I.)
August 29, 2007 82 MOTION to Seal Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Defendants' Motion to Strike Demands by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Manual Filing# 2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Seal)(Chatterjee, I.)
August 29, 2007 81 MOTION to Seal Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, and Exhibit 5 to the Declaration of Monte Cooper ISO Same by Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Manual Filing# 2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Seal)(Chatterjee, I.)
August 29, 2007 80 MOTION to Seal Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Mark Zuckerberg's Motion to Dismiss by Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Manual Filing# 2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Seal)(Chatterjee, I.)
August 28, 2007 79 STATUS REPORT - AMENDED JOINT REPORT by Connectu, Inc., Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Protocol)(Chatterjee, I.)
August 24, 2007 78 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on July 25, 2007 before Judge Woodlock. Court Reporter: Pamela R. Owens. The original transcripts are maintained by the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter at pamowens1@earthlink.net or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah)
August 24, 2007 77 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on July 25, 2007 before Judge Woodlock. Court Reporter: Marcia G. Patrisso. The original transcripts are maintained by the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter at 617/737-8728 or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah)
August 17, 2007 76 DECLARATION --Supplemental Declaration of Meredith H. Schoenfeld in support of First Amended Complaint-- by Connectu, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 67# 2 Exhibit 76# 3 Exhibit 81# 4 Exhibit 84# 5 Exhibit 85)(Hornick, John)
August 17, 2007 75 NOTICE by Connectu, Inc. re 67 Notice (Other) Errata to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint (Hornick, John)
August 17, 2007 74 NOTICE by Connectu, Inc. --NOTICE OF FILING WITH CLERK'S OFFICE-- (Hornick, John) Modified on 8/20/2007 (Nici, Richard).Exhibits received 8/20/07.
August 17, 2007 73 Assented to MOTION to Seal --ASSENTED-TO MOTION TO SEAL PLAINTIFFS' EXHIBITS TO SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF MEREDITH H. SHOENFELD by Connectu, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hornick, John)
August 14, 2007 Judge Robert B. Collings: Electronic NOTICE entered re 65 Joint Status Report. With respect to Part III "Additional Issues", since these matters were not the subject of motions to compel in the earlier action, the Court will take no action respecting them until a proper motion is filed in the instant case PRECEDED by the mandatory meet-and-confer procedure as required by both the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules.
August 14, 2007 Judge Robert B. Collings: The Court has reviewed the 65 Status Report regarding outstanding discovery issues filed July 28, 2007. The pleading is 14 pages long and recites a number of outstanding disputes. The Court has further reviewed the transcript of the July 25, 2007 hearing before Judge Woodlock in which the following statements are made: Mr. Hornick (at p. 32): "All of the discovery disputes we had with defendants, I believe, have been resolved based upon conversations we've had in the last two weeks." "With respect to the discovery we have provided, there are no motions to compel pending [e]xcept -- there are two, but I believe our agreement is that they are going to be withdrawn. The defendants have requested to meet and confer regarding some additional discovery they would like to have from us and we will give it to them to the extent that it exists." Mr. Chatterjee at p. 47: Our expectation, actually, is most, if not all, the motions are probably going to be taken off the table." The Court perceives a not so subtle "disconnect" between the representations made to Judge Woodlock and what is contained in the Joint Report. Accordingly, counsel are ORDERED to file, on or before the close of business on August 28, 2007, an UPDATED Joint Report which accurately represents as of that date whether there are any current discovery disputes, and if so, what they are. This Order does not apply to defendant Saverin in view of the stay of discovery which Judge Woodlock granted to him.
August 13, 2007 Set/Reset Answer Deadlines for Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg, Eduardo Saverin: Answers to 71 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg, Eduardo Saverin, filed by Connectu, Inc. are due by 8/29/07. (Lovett, Jarrett)
August 11, 2007 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Electronic ORDER entered granting 72 Motion for Extension of Time, response to First Amended Complaint due by 8/29/2007. (Woodlock, Douglas)
August 10, 2007 72 MOTION for Extension of Time to August 29, 2007 to Respond to First Amended Complaint by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Sutton, Theresa)
August 9, 2007 70 NOTICE by Connectu, Inc. of Filing with the Clerk's Office (Hornick, John)
August 9, 2007 69 Assented to MOTION to Seal Document --Exhibit to the Declaration of Meredith H. Schoenfeld by Connectu, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hornick, John)
August 8, 2007 71 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg, Eduardo Saverin, filed by Connectu, Inc.. FILED UNDER SEAL WITH EXHIBITS 5,6,8,11,13,23,28,29,37-79,41,44,45,48-55,56A,57,59-64,67-71,78,80,81, 83 TO THE DECLARATION OF Meredith H. Schoenfeld IN SUPPORT OF Plaintiffs' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. (Nici, Richard) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/9/2007 (Nici, Richard). Modified on 8/14/2007 (Nici, Richard).
August 8, 2007 68 DECLARATION of Meredith H. Schoenfeld in support of First Amended Complaint by Connectu, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 part 1# 2 Exhibit 1 part 2# 3 Exhibit 1A# 4 Exhibit 2# 5 Exhibit 3 part 1# 6 Exhibit 3 part 2# 7 Exhibit 4# 8 Exhibit 5# 9 Exhibit 6# 10 Exhibit 7# 11 Exhibit 8# 12 Exhibit 9# 13 Exhibit 10# 14 Exhibit 11# 15 Exhibit 12# 16 Exhibit 13# 17 Exhibit 14# 18 Exhibit 15# 19 Exhibit 16# 20 Exhibit 17# 21 Exhibit 18# 22 Exhibit 19# 23 Exhibit 20# 24 Exhibit 21# 25 Exhibit 22# 26 Exhibit 23# 27 Exhibit 24# 28 Exhibit 25# 29 Exhibit 26# 30 Exhibit 27# 31 Exhibit 28# 32 Exhibit 29# 33 Exhibit 29A# 34 Exhibit 30# 35 Exhibit 31# 36 Exhibit 32# 37 Exhibit 33# 38 Exhibit 34# 39 Exhibit 35# 40 Exhibit 36# 41 Exhibit 37# 42 Exhibit 38# 43 Exhibit 39# 44 Exhibit 40# 45 Exhibit 41# 46 Exhibit 42# 47 Exhibit 43# 48 Exhibit 44# 49 Exhibit 45# 50 Exhibit 46# 51 Exhibit 47# 52 Exhibit 50# 53 Exhibit 51# 54 Exhibit 52# 55 Exhibit 53# 56 Exhibit 54# 57 Exhibit 55# 58 Exhibit 56# 59 Exhibit 56A# 60 Exhibit 56B# 61 Exhibit 56C# 62 Exhibit 56D# 63 Exhibit 56E# 64 Exhibit 56F# 65 Exhibit 56G# 66 Exhibit 56H# 67 Exhibit 56I# 68 Exhibit 56J# 69 Exhibit 58# 70 Exhibit 59# 71 Exhibit 60# 72 Exhibit 61# 73 Exhibit 62# 74 Exhibit 63# 75 Exhibit 64# 76 Exhibit 65# 77 Exhibit 66# 78 Exhibit 67# 79 Exhibit 68# 80 Exhibit 69# 81 Exhibit 70# 82 Exhibit 71# 83 Exhibit 72# 84 Exhibit 73# 85 Exhibit 74# 86 Exhibit 75# 87 Exhibit 76# 88 Exhibit 78# 89 Exhibit 80# 90 Exhibit 81# 91 Exhibit 82# 92 Exhibit 83)(Hornick, John) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/9/2007 (Nici, Richard).
August 8, 2007 67 NOTICE by Connectu, Inc. Notice of Filing with Clerk's Office (Hornick, John)
August 8, 2007 66 Assented to MOTION to Seal Document Assented-To Motion to Seal Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint and Exhibits to the Declaration of Meredith H. Schoenfeld by Connectu, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hornick, John)
July 28, 2007 65 STATUS REPORT Joint Report Re Discovery by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Connectu, Inc., Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg, Eduardo Saverin. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A: Proposed Protocol)(Sutton, Theresa)
July 25, 2007 64 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : ORDER entered. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings Referred for: Full pretrial case management, not including dispositive motions(Lovett, Jarrett)
July 25, 2007 Set/Reset Deadlines: Paintiff's Amended Complaint due by 8/8/2007. (Lovett, Jarrett)
July 25, 2007 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Motion Hearing held on 7/25/2007 re 16 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., 17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Dustin Moskovitz, 30 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Eduardo Saverin: Court reserves ruling on outstanding Motions to Dismiss with leave to file Amended Complaint by August 8, 2007; the Complaint Plaintiff chooses to proceed upon as of August 8, 2007 shall be the governing pleading in the case and claims dismissed in response to the Motions to Dismiss may not be restated in this proceeding without leave of Court for good cause shown. If Plaintiff opts not to file Amended Complaint, Plaintiff may supplement briefing by August 8, 2007 and Defendants may file supplemental briefing on August 22, 2007. If Plaintiff files Amended Complaint, Defendants may file Motions to Dismiss by August 22, 2007. Plaintiff may then file Opposition brief of up to 40 pages by September 12, 2007. Defendants may reply by September 26,2007. Discovery will be stayed with respect to Defendant Saverin, provided he files affidavits as directed by the Court on the record; if Defendant Saverin's Motion to Dismiss is denied the stay will be lifted without further modification of the existing schedule. All other discovery will proceed as scheduled, under the direction of Magistrate Judge Collings. (Court Reporter Marie Cloonan) (Lovett, Jarrett)
July 25, 2007 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Electronic ORDER entered reserving ruling on 30 Motion to Dismiss; granting 38 Motion for Leave to File; granting 39 Motion for Leave to File; granting 40 Motion for Leave to File; denying 43 Motion to Stay; granting 55 Motion for Leave to File; granting 58 Motion for Leave to File; reserving ruling on 16 Motion to Dismiss; reserving ruling on 17 Motion to Dismiss; reserving ruling on 18 Motion to Dismiss (Woodlock, Douglas)
June 23, 2007 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 17 MOTION to Dismiss, 18 MOTION to Dismiss, 16 MOTION to Dismiss, 30 MOTION to Dismiss : Motion Hearing set for 7/25/2007 02:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. (Lovett, Jarrett)
June 15, 2007 63 NOTICE by Connectu, Inc. - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF CONNECTU'S MOTION FOR CONTEMPT (Hornick, John)
June 12, 2007 62 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : ORDER entered REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings. Referred for: All pretrial proceedings, excluding dispositive motions.(Rynne, Michelle)
June 12, 2007 61 Judge Robert B. Collings : PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: NOTICE OF MOTIONS FILED BY PLAINTIFF CONNECTU REQUIRING RESOLUTION (#8) entered. (Dolan, Kathleen)
June 8, 2007 60 NOTICE by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg (NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION) (Bauer, Steven)
June 8, 2007 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Scheduling Conference held on 6/8/2007. Motion to Stay is denied. Motion hearing regarding motions to dismiss is set for 7/25/07 at 2:30 p.m. Any attorney not admitted to practice in Massachusetts USDC must file a motion to appear pro hac vice. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice are not allowed to sign pleadings until they have registered from CM/ECF. Discovery in 04-11923 may be used in this case. Depositions will be limited to 18. Parties can anticipate an Order from Magistrate Judge Collings regarding previous motions filed in 04-11923. Within 5 days, counsel shall report to the court whether they are still pressing Bill of Costs and Motion for contempt filed in 04-11923. (Court Reporter Marie Cloonan.) (Rynne, Michelle)
June 6, 2007 59 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Eduardo Saverin.(Hampton, Daniel)
June 6, 2007 58 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Facebook Defs' Reply ISO Mtn to Stay Pending Appeal to 1st Circ. by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Sutton, Theresa)
June 4, 2007 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING:Scheduling Conference reset for 6/8/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. (Rynne, Michelle)
May 30, 2007 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling Scheduling Conference. Scheduling conference previously set for 5/31/07 is CANCELED. Notice will issue setting new date for scheduling conference. (Rynne, Michelle)
May 29, 2007 57 NOTICE by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg of Certification of Conference Under Local Rule 16.1(D)(3) (Chatterjee, I.)
May 29, 2007 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Electronic ORDER entered denying 52 Motion to Continue (Nici, Richard)
May 29, 2007 56 Opposition re 43 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Connectu, LLC's Appeal to the First Circuit of Judge Woodlock's Order of Dismissal in Related Case No. 1:04-cv-11923-DPW filed by Connectu, Inc.. (Hornick, John)
May 24, 2007 55 MOTION for Leave to File Reply ISO Motion to Dismiss Claims Against Saverin by Eduardo Saverin. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Reply to ISO Motion to Dismiss Claims Against Saverin# 2 Exhibit [Proposed Order] Granting Motion for Leave to File Reply ISO Motion to Dismiss Claims Against Saverin)(Hampton, Daniel)
May 23, 2007 54 JOINT STATEMENT of counsel - LOCAL RULE 16.1(D) JOINT STATEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 ConnectU Certification)(Hornick, John)
May 23, 2007 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : ADMITTED ATTORNEYS MUST REGISTER FOR CM/ECF.Electronic ORDER entered granting 46 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Bhanu Sadasivan for Eduardo Saverin, Nathan E Shafroth for Eduardo Saverin, Annette L. Hurst for Eduardo Saverin, Robert B. Hawk for Eduardo Saverin; granting 48 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Bhanu Sadasivan for Eduardo Saverin, Nathan E Shafroth for Eduardo Saverin, Annette L. Hurst for Eduardo Saverin, Robert B. Hawk for Eduardo Saverin; granting 49 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Bhanu Sadasivan for Eduardo Saverin, Nathan E Shafroth for Eduardo Saverin, Annette L. Hurst for Eduardo Saverin, Robert B. Hawk for Eduardo Saverin; granting 50 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Bhanu Sadasivan for Eduardo Saverin, Nathan E Shafroth for Eduardo Saverin, Annette L. Hurst for Eduardo Saverin, Robert B. Hawk for Eduardo Saverin RECEIPT# 80226 $200(Nici, Richard)
May 22, 2007 Filing fee: $ 100.00, receipt number 79670 for motions # 20-21 ( Neel Chatterjee and Monte cooper) (Diskes, Sheila)
May 22, 2007 Filing fee: $ 50.00, receipt number 79670 for motion # 19 ( Theresa Sutton) (Diskes, Sheila)
May 22, 2007 Filing fee: $ 50.00, receipt number 80226 for motion # 49 ( atty Hurst) (Diskes, Sheila)
May 22, 2007 Filing fee: $ 50.00, receipt number 80226 motion #48 ( Atty Shafroth) (Diskes, Sheila)
May 22, 2007 Filing fee: $ 50.00, receipt number 80226 for motion # 46 ( Atty Sadasivan) (Diskes, Sheila)
May 22, 2007 Filing fee: $ 50.00, receipt number 80150 for motion # 42 ( G. Hopkin) (Diskes, Sheila)
May 22, 2007 Filing fee: $ 50.00, receipt number 80226 for motion # 50 ( atty Hawk) (Diskes, Sheila)
May 22, 2007 Filing fee: $ 50.00, receipt number 80150 for motion #41 ( Yvonne P. Greer) (Diskes, Sheila)
May 18, 2007 53 Opposition re 52 MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference to June 12, 2007 filed by Connectu, Inc.. (Esquenet, Margaret)
May 18, 2007 52 MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference to June 12, 2007 by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg.(Bauer, Steven)
May 18, 2007 51 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Eduardo Saverin. Document received: Proposed Order on Assented-To Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Bhanu K. Sadasivan. (Attachments: # 1)(Hampton, Daniel)
May 18, 2007 50 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Robert B. Hawk by Eduardo Saverin. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Robert B. Hawk, Esquire in Support of Assented-To Motion for Admissoin Pro Hac Vice# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hampton, Daniel)
May 18, 2007 49 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Annette L. Hurst by Eduardo Saverin. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Annette L. HUrst, Esq. in Support of Assented-To Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hampton, Daniel)
May 18, 2007 48 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Nathan E. Shafroth by Eduardo Saverin. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Nathan E. Shafroth in Support of Assented-to Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hampton, Daniel)
May 18, 2007 47 AFFIDAVIT of Bhanu K. Sadasivan in Support re 46 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Bhanu K. Sadasivan filed by Eduardo Saverin. (Hampton, Daniel)
May 18, 2007 46 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Bhanu K. Sadasivan by Eduardo Saverin.(Hampton, Daniel)
May 16, 2007 45 Certificate of Consolutation by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg re 43 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Connectu, LLC's Appeal to the First Circuit of Judge Woodlock's Order of Dismissal in Related Case No. 1:04-cv-11923-DPW CERTIFICATION PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 7.1 (a)(2) (Chatterjee, I.) Modified on 5/17/2007 (Nici, Richard).
May 16, 2007 44 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg, Eduardo Saverin. Document received: Facebook's Motion to Stay. (Chatterjee, I.)
May 16, 2007 43 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Connectu, LLC's Appeal to the First Circuit of Judge Woodlock's Order of Dismissal in Related Case No. 1:04-cv-11923-DPW by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg, Eduardo Saverin.(Chatterjee, I.)
May 16, 2007 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : ADMITTED ATTORNEYS MUST REGISTER FOR CM/ECF. Electronic ORDER entered granting 41 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added G. Hopkins Guy, III for Dustin Moskovitz and Andrew McCollum, Yvonne P Greer for Dustin Moskovitz,Andrew McCollum,Christopher Hughes,Thefacebook LLC,Facebook, Inc.,Mark Zuckerberg; granting 42 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added G. Hopkins Guy, III for Dustin Moskovitz and Andrew McCollum, Yvonne P Greer for Dustin Moskovitz,Andrew McCollum,Christopher Hughes,Thefacebook LLC,Facebook, Inc.,Mark Zuckerberg (Nici, Richard)Receipt #80150 $100
May 16, 2007 42 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of G. Hopkins Guy, III by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of G. Hopkins Guy III)(Oczek, Jeremy)
May 16, 2007 41 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Yvonne P. Greer by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Yvonne Greer)(Oczek, Jeremy)
May 14, 2007 40 MOTION for Leave to File Moskovitz, McCollum and Hughes Reply to PL's Oppo to Mtn to Dismiss by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Chatterjee, I.)
May 14, 2007 39 MOTION for Leave to File to File Zuckerberg's Reply to PL's Oppo to Mtns to Dismiss by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Chatterjee, I.)
May 14, 2007 38 MOTION for Leave to File to File Facebook and TheFacebook's Reply to PL's Oppo to Mtn to Dismiss by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Chatterjee, I.) Modified on 5/15/2007 (Hassett, Kathy).
May 8, 2007 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel P. Kaufman on behalf of Connectu, Inc. (Kaufman, Daniel)
May 7, 2007 36 Opposition re 30 MOTION to Dismiss - - CONNECTU INC.'S OPPOSITION TO SAVERIN'S MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Connectu, Inc.. (Hornick, John)
May 7, 2007 35 DECLARATION re 34 Opposition to Motion - DECLARATION OF MARGARET A. ESQUENET IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S CONSOLIDATED OPPOSITION TO FACEBOOK DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS by Connectu, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Hornick, John)
May 7, 2007 34 Opposition re 16 MOTION to Dismiss, 17 MOTION to Dismiss, 18 MOTION to Dismiss - - CONNECTU INC.'S CONSOLIDATED OPPOSITION TO FACEBOOK DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS filed by Connectu, Inc.. (Hornick, John)
May 7, 2007 33 NOTICE by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg of Joining Defendant Eduardo Saverin's Motion To Dismiss Complaint (Sutton, Theresa)
May 7, 2007 32 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference: Scheduling Conference set for 5/31/2007 02:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock and Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings. (Rynne, Michelle)
May 3, 2007 31 MEMORANDUM in Support re 30 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Eduardo Saverin. (Hampton, Daniel)
May 3, 2007 30 MOTION to Dismiss by Eduardo Saverin.(Hampton, Daniel)
May 3, 2007 29 DECLARATION re 28 Response - DECLARATION OF MEREDITH H. SCHOENFELD IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO FACEBOOK DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO NOTICE OF MOTIONS FILED BY PLAINTIFF CONNECTU REQUIRING RESOLUTION by Connectu, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Hornick, John)
May 3, 2007 28 Response by Connectu, Inc. to 8 Notice (Other) - CONNECTU'S OPPOSITION TO FACEBOOK DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO NOTICE OF MOTIONS FILED BY PLAINTIFF CONNECTU REQUIRING RESOLUTION. (Hornick, John)
May 2, 2007 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Electronic ORDER entered granting 13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Margaret A. Esquenet for Connectu, Inc., John F. Hornick for Connectu, Inc., Meredith H. Schoenfeld for Connectu, Inc. (Nici, Richard)Receipt# 79584 $150
May 2, 2007 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Electronic ORDER entered granting 19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Theresa A. Sutton for Dustin Moskovitz and Andrew McCollum, I. Neel Chatterjee for Dustin Moskovitz and Andrew McCollum, Monte Cooper for Dustin Moskovitz and Andrew McCollum, granting 20 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Theresa A. Sutton for Dustin Moskovitz and Andrew McCollum, I. Neel Chatterjee for Dustin Moskovitz and Andrew McCollum, Monte Cooper for Dustin Moskovitz and Andrew McCollum, granting 21 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Theresa A. Sutton for Dustin Moskovitz and Andrew McCollum, I. Neel Chatterjee for Dustin Moskovitz and Andrew McCollum, Monte Cooper for Dustin Moskovitz and Andrew McCollum receipt # 79670 $150 (Nici, Richard)
April 27, 2007 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Electronic ORDER entered granting 24 Motion for Leave to File ONE CONSOLIDATED OPPOSITION TO MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATION. Memorandum not to exceed 40 pages. (Rynne, Michelle)
April 26, 2007 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Gordon P. Katz on behalf of Eduardo Saverin (Katz, Gordon)
April 26, 2007 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel K. Hampton on behalf of Eduardo Saverin (Hampton, Daniel)
April 26, 2007 25 NOTICE by Connectu, Inc. re 24 MOTION for Leave to File ONE CONSOLIDATED OPPOSITION TO FACEBOOK DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS; AND MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATION --NOTICE OF CONSENT BY FACEBOOK DEFENDANTS (McConchie, Scott)
April 25, 2007 24 MOTION for Leave to File ONE CONSOLIDATED OPPOSITION TO FACEBOOK DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS; AND MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATION by Connectu, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McConchie, Scott)
April 25, 2007 23 Response by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg to 8 Notice (Other) Response to "Notice of Motions Filed By Plaintiff ConnectU Requiring Resolution". (Bauer, Steven)
April 24, 2007 22 NOTICE by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg re 17 MOTION to Dismiss, 18 MOTION to Dismiss, 16 MOTION to Dismiss of Combined Certification Pursuant to Rule 7.1(a) (Bauer, Steven)
April 24, 2007 21 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Monte M.F. Cooper by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Monte M.F. Cooper)(Oczek, Jeremy)
April 24, 2007 20 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of I. Neel Chatterjee by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of I. Neel Chatterjee)(Oczek, Jeremy)
April 24, 2007 19 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Theresa A. Sutton by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Theresa A Sutton)(Oczek, Jeremy)
April 23, 2007 18 Memorandum in support of MOTION to Dismiss by Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bauer, Steven) Modified on 7/13/2007 (Nici, Richard).
April 23, 2007 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Electronic ORDER entered denying 10 Motion for Extension of Time to respond to complaint. (Rynne, Michelle)
April 23, 2007 17 MOTION to Dismiss by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bauer, Steven)
April 23, 2007 16 MOTION to Dismiss by Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bauer, Steven)
April 19, 2007 15 Supplemental Opposition re 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to 05/09/2007 to TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT - - ADDENDUM TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD filed by Connectu, Inc.. (McConchie, Scott)
April 19, 2007 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed Andrew McCollum served on 4/11/2007, answer due 5/1/2007. (McConchie, Scott)
April 18, 2007 13 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of John F. Hornick, Margaret A. Esquenet, and Meredith H. Schoenfeld by Connectu, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Margaret A. Esquenet# 2 Declaration of John F. Hornick# 3 Declaration of Meredith H. Schoenfeld)(Tighe, Daniel)
April 17, 2007 12 Opposition re 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to 05/09/2007 to TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT filed by Connectu, Inc.. (Tighe, Daniel)
April 17, 2007 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy P. Oczek on behalf of Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg (Oczek, Jeremy)
April 17, 2007 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to 05/09/2007 to TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg.(Bauer, Steven)
April 11, 2007 9 DECLARATION re 8 Notice (Other) - DECLARATION OF MEREDITH H. SCHOENFELD IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTIONS FILED BY PLAINTIFF CONNECTU REQUIRING RESOLUTION by Connectu, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Tighe, Daniel)
April 11, 2007 8 NOTICE by Connectu, Inc. - NOTICE OF MOTIONS FILED BY PLAINTIFF CONNECTU REQUIRING RESOLUTION (Tighe, Daniel)
April 11, 2007 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed Mark Zuckerberg served on 4/2/2007, answer due 4/23/2007. (Tighe, Daniel)
April 11, 2007 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Christopher Hughes served on 4/9/2007, answer due 4/30/2007. (Tighe, Daniel)
April 11, 2007 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Dustin Moskovitz served on 4/7/2007, answer due 4/27/2007. (Tighe, Daniel)
April 11, 2007 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed Thefacebook LLC served on 4/2/2007, answer due 4/23/2007. (Tighe, Daniel)
April 11, 2007 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed Facebook, Inc. served on 4/2/2007, answer due 4/23/2007. (Tighe, Daniel)
March 28, 2007 Filing fee: $ 350.00, receipt number 79064 for 1 Complaint (Filo, Jennifer)
March 28, 2007 2 REPORT on the filing of copyright case. (Filo, Jennifer)
March 28, 2007 Summons Issued as to Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg, Eduardo Saverin. (Filo, Jennifer)
March 28, 2007 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Douglas P. Woodlock assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Collings (Filo, Jennifer)
March 28, 2007 1 COMPLAINT against all defendants , filed by Connectu, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet # 2 Category Sheet# 3 Exhibit A# 4 Exhibit B)(Filo, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Connectu, Inc. v. Facebook, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Zuckerberg
Represented By: Theresa A. Sutton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dustin Moskovitz
Represented By: Theresa A. Sutton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Represented By: Sean A. Lincoln
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Hughes
Represented By: Theresa A. Sutton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew McCollum
Represented By: Steven M. Bauer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eduardo Saverin
Represented By: Steven M. Bauer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thefacebook LLC
Represented By: I. Neel Chatterjee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connectu, Inc.
Represented By: Sarah Hartley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]