Commonwealth of Massachusetts v. United States Department of Health and Human Services et al

Plaintiff: Commonwealth of Massachusetts
Defendant: United States Department of Health and Human Services, Kathleen Sebelius, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, Eric K. Shinseki and United States of America
Case Number: 1:2009cv11156
Filed: July 8, 2009
Court: Massachusetts District Court
Office: Boston Office
County: Suffolk
Presiding Judge: Joseph L. Tauro
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 22, 2010 45 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Joseph L. Tauro:ORDER entered. DENIED 10 Motion to Intervene or Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief; DENIED 15 Motion for Leave to Clarify Motion of September 17, 2009; DENIED 24 Motion for Leave to Intervene and File a Motion to Dismiss. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
June 16, 2010 55 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Joseph L. Tauro: ORDER entered DENIED IN PART and DENIED IN PART AS MOOT re 53 Motion to Leave to Intervene and Motion to Compel Ruling pursuant to 28 U.S.C.A. § 1652; Rule 24 (b) United States Constitution Article IV § 4 and 14th Amendment by Mark A. Thomas. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
July 8, 2010 57 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Joseph L. Tauro: ORDER entered. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss re 16 is DENIED and Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment re 26 is ALLOWED. IT IS ORDERED. (Main Document 57 replaced to correct docket entry on 7/8/2010) (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde).
July 8, 2010 58 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Joseph L. Tauro: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss re 16 is DENIED and Plaintff's Motion for Summary Judgment re 26 is ALLOWED. AN ORDER HAS ISSUED.(Main Document 58 replaced on 7/8/2010 to correct docket entry ) (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde).
August 12, 2010 63 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Joseph L. Tauro: JUDGMENT ORDER entered. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
August 24, 2010 65 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Joseph L. Tauro: ORDER entered ALLOWED 64 Motion to Stay of Injunctive Relief Pending Appeal. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
August 24, 2010 66 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Joseph L. Tauro: ORDER entered 64 . The Defendants' is GRANTED, and the injunctive relief entered as part of the judgment is this action is stayed pending the disposition of any appeal filed by the Defendants. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Commonwealth of Massachusetts v. United States Department of Health and Human Services et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commonwealth of Massachusetts
Represented By: Jonathan B. Miller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Health and Human Services
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Sebelius
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Veterans Affairs
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric K. Shinseki
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]