Bower v. El-Nady Bower et al

Plaintiff: Colin Bower
Defendant: Mirvat El-Nady Bower and EgyptAir Airlines Company
 
Case Number: 1:2010cv10405
Filed: March 8, 2010
 
Court: Massachusetts District Court
Office: Boston Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy Gertner
 
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 10, 2011 144 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting 134 Motion Preclude Expert Witness Testimony; granting 137 Motion in Limine (RGS, law3)
February 21, 2012 171 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered re: 157 Motion to Rule on Subject Matter Jurisdiction. (RGS, law3)
March 21, 2012 175 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting 149 EgyptAir's Motion for Summary Judgment (RGS, law3)
March 22, 2012 176 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. Separate and final judgment entered for EgyptAir pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b).(RGS, law3)
August 27, 2013 214 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER on Assessment of Damages entered. (RGS, law2)
February 11, 2011 75 Opinion or Order of the Court Ch. Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part 30 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Response to Subpoena from Michael Traft; denying 44 Bruce Bower's Motion for Protective Order; granting in part and denying in part 59 Bruce Bower's Motion to Quash Subpoena; and taking under advisement 38 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Yahoo! and Google to Comply with Subpoena, and 16 Defendant EgyptAir's Motion to Dismiss or Transfer Venue. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
April 5, 2011 84 Opinion or Order of the Court Ch. Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER denying 38 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Yahoo! and Google to Comply with Subpoena. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
May 9, 2011 99 Opinion or Order of the Court Ch. Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: FURTHER ORDER entered re 30 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Response to Subpoena from Michael Traft. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Bower v. El-Nady Bower et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colin Bower
Represented By: Howard M. Cooper
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mirvat El-Nady Bower
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EgyptAir Airlines Company
Represented By: Shalissa M. Dougherty
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]