Discount Video Center, Inc. v. Does 1 - 29

Defendant: Does 1 - 29
Plaintiff: Discount Video Center, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2012cv10805
Filed: May 4, 2012
Court: Massachusetts District Court
Office: Boston Office
County: Barnstable
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M. Gorton
Referring Judge: Leo T. Sorokin
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 5, 2012 10 Opinion or Order of the Court Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered denying 8 Motion to Quash; denying 8 Motion to Dismiss. (King, Kristin)
August 10, 2012 31 Opinion or Order of the Court Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered re: Pending Motions to Quash (Docket #s 8, 12, 16) and Motion to Proceed Anonymously of John Doe No. 6. (Docket # 15). The Court hereby: QUASHES all of the subpoenas issued pursuant t o the permission for early discovery; ALLOWS IN PART the Motions to QUASH (Docket #s 8, 12, 15, & 16) as explained herein; PROHIBITS the Plaintiff, its counsel and its agents from using in any way the identities of the subscribers it has already obta ined (or does obtain) as a result of the subpoena process (except that within three days, the Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order upon all of the subscribers whose identities it has learned to date (and such further subscribers, if any, it lea rns of in the future as a result of the already issued subpoenas); ORDERS that within three days, the Plaintiff shall notify each ISP recipient of a subpoena that it shall immediately cease all efforts to comply with the subpoena and shall provide ea ch ISP with a copy of this Order; Notwithstanding the foregoing, the Plaintiff may, within thirty days, request leave for early discovery as explained herein. Insofar as John Doe No. 2 seeks dismissal, that request is the subject of a separate Report and Recommendation issued today. See attached Memorandum and Order for further rulings. (Chernetsky, James)
October 18, 2012 47 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. ORDER ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS "Report and Recommendation accepted and adopted." Action on motion: ; adopting Report and Recommendations re 32 Report and Recommendations.; denying as moot 8 Motion to Dismiss filed by John Doe 2. (Moore, Kellyann)
November 7, 2012 51 Opinion or Order of the Court Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered. Order on Pending Motions for Ex Parte Discovery and Order to Show Cause. For the foregoing reasons, the Plaintiffs' Renewed Motions for Ex Parte Discovery (12-cv-10805-NMG, Docket # 43; 12-cv- 10532-GAO, Docket # 43; and, 12-cv-10758-GAO, Docket # 37) are DENIED. It is further ORDERED that by the close of business on November 16, 2012, the Plaintiffs shall show cause why their cases should not be dismissed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) for failure to effect timely service. See attached Order. (Chernetsky, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Discount Video Center, Inc. v. Does 1 - 29
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 - 29
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Discount Video Center, Inc.
Represented By: Marvin N. Cable
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]