Brown v. Pete et al

Defendant: Joseph Pete, Curtis Cinelli and Thomas Brown
Plaintiff: Manson Brown
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv11687
Filed: September 10, 2012
 
Court: Massachusetts District Court
Office: Boston Office
County: Middlesex
Presiding Judge: Mark L. Wolf
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 8, 2013 10 Featured Case Judge Joseph L. Tauro: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered: Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in Court (Docket No. 3), and his Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Docket No. 4)are DENIED without prejudice; Within 21 days of the date of this Memorandum and Order, Plaintiff shall file a renewed Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis signed under the penalties of perjury, or this action may be dismissed; Within 35 days of the date of this Memorandum and Order, Plaintiff shall demon strate good cause in writing why his claims against Sheriff Thomas Brown should not be dismissed; Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel (Docket No. 2) is DENIED without prejudice to renew after the Defendants have filed a response to the Complaint; Upon resolution of the filing fee issue, an Order shall enter directing the issuance of summonses as to Defendants Lt. Joseph Pete of the Department of Correction Fugitive Apprehension Unit in Milford, Massachusetts, and Trooper Curtis C inelli of the Massachusetts State Police; and If Plaintiff is permitted to proceed in forma pauperis, an Order shall enter directing the United States Marshal Service to effect service of process, and to advance the costs of service. (PSSA, 1)[Remark: IFP form sent with copy of Memorandum and Order, copy of the Complaint (per plaintiff's request on January 2, 2013) and docket sheet].
June 25, 2013 55 Featured Case Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered. REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 36 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Joseph Pepe. Recommendation: The motion to dismiss should be ALLOWED with respect to defendant Pepe, and th e claims against him should be DISMISSED without prejudice to the plaintiff refiling them after he has administratively exhausted them; the claims against defendants Cinelli and Brown should be DISMISSED without prejudice to the plaintiff refiling them in the proper venue. (Objections to R&R due by 7/9/2013). ORDER entered denying 45 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Manson Brown. (Robinson, Amy)
July 17, 2013 61 Featured Case Judge Joseph L. Tauro: ORDER ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS entered. After considering the parties Objections 58 , 59 , this court ACCEPTS and ADOPTSthe June 25, 2013, Report and Recommendation 55 of Chief Magistrate Judge Sorokin. For the re asons set forth in the Report and Recommendation, this court hereby orders that: Defendant Pepe's Motion to Dismiss 36 , as joined by Defendants Cinelli and Brown at the June 21 Status Conference, is ALLOWED. Plaintiffs Motion to Appoint Counsel 45 is DENIED. This case is CLOSED. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Brown v. Pete et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Pete
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis Cinelli
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Brown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manson Brown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]