McMann et al v. United States of America

Plaintiff: Paul J. McMann
Defendant: United States of America and Eric Holder
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv11872
Filed: October 5, 2012
 
Court: Massachusetts District Court
Office: Boston Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Patti B. Saris
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
December 10, 2012 14 Featured Case Judge Patti B. Saris: PROCEDURAL ORDER entered. The Court will not permit the plaintiff to proceed in forma pauperis at this time because he has not submitted the requisite request. Within 21 days of the date of this Procedural Order, plaintiff e ither shall (1) pay the $350.00 filing fee; or (2) submit the affidavit required under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(1). The Clerk mailed the Procedural Order to plaintiff with an Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs.(PSSA, 4)
March 26, 2013 19 Featured Case Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered. The motion to use existing financial affidavit (Docket No. 17) and declaration (Docket No. 5) are construed as motions for leave to proceed in forma pauperis and are granted. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(1), the Court assesses an initial partial filing fee of $10..80. The remainder of the fee, $339.20, shall be collected in accordance with 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(2). The motion for appointment of counsel (Docket No. 2) and motion for hearing (Docket No. 13) are denied without prejudice. The motion to correct court record (Docket No. 16) is granted. The Clerk shall issue summonses for service of the complaint on defendants Holder and the United States. The Clerk shall send the summonses, complaint, and this Order to the plaintiff, who must thereafter serve the defendants in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m).The defendants are required to respond to the complaint. (PSSA, 4)
April 22, 2013 25 Featured Case Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered allowing 24 Motion for Clarification and the initial, partial filing fee shall be collected only when funds exist pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(1).(PSSA, 4)
October 17, 2013 39 Featured Case Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered that Plaintiff's Motion 34 Requesting an Explanation and to Receive Notice of all Entries on This Docket by the Court is granted as to plaintiffs request for copies of the docket sheet and defendants pleadings to date. The motion shall be DENIED in all other respects. The Clerk will mail a copy of this Order to plaintiff with a copy of the docket sheet and copies of the pleadings filed by defendants to date. (PSSA, 4)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: McMann et al v. United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul J. McMann
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Holder
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]