Sarvis v. Polyvore, Inc.

Plaintiff: Robert Sarvis
Defendant: Polyvore, Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv12233
Filed: November 30, 2012
 
Court: Massachusetts District Court
Office: Boston Office
County: Nantucket
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M. Gorton
 
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 9, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ORDER entered. Certification of Issue to State Court, REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Polyvore, Inc. is ALLOWED as to the vicarious infringement cla im (Count Five). This court further RECOMMENDS that the motion to dismiss be ALLOWED on or after September 9, 2013, as to the remaining counts unless plaintiff files a motion for leave to amend the amended complaint prior to September 9, 2013. ( Objections to R&R due by 8/23/2013)(Feeney, Eileen)
September 20, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. ORDER ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS Action on motion: ; granting 16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim as to the vicarious infringement claim (Count five); adopting Report and Recommendations re 34 Report and Recommendations. "After consideration of Plaintiff's Objection thereto (Docket No. 35 ), Report and Recommendation is accepted and adopted." (Moore, Kellyann)
June 30, 2014 51 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: "For the foregoing reasons, 1) Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint (Docket No. 37 ) is ALLOWED; 2) Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a Reply to De fendant's Opposition (Docket No. 44 ) is DENIED AS MOOT; 3) Plaintiff's Motion to Strike (Docket No. 45 ) is DENIED AS MOOT; and 4) Plaintiff's Motion to Reconsider Dismissal of Plaintiff's Count for Polyvore's Vicarious Infringement (Docket No. 46 ) is DENIED. So ordered. "(Moore, Kellyann)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Sarvis v. Polyvore, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Sarvis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Polyvore, Inc.
Represented By: William F. Benson
Represented By: Christopher Muller
Represented By: Orin Snyder
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]