Williams et al v. Spencer et al

Plaintiff: Shekeira Williams and Donald Williams
Defendant: Luis S. Spencer, Larry Amblo, Bruce Gelb, Osvaldo Vidal, Lesley Pierre and Brian McDonald
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv10083
Filed: January 14, 2013
 
Court: Massachusetts District Court
Office: Boston Office
County: Suffolk
Presiding Judge: F. Dennis Saylor
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 17, 2013 6 Featured Case Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered: The motions for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (# 2, #4) are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. If Shekeira Williams would like to pursue this action she must, within thirty-five (35) days of the date of this order, either (1) pay her portion of the filing fee ($175); or (2) file a new motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis that complies with the requirements discussed in this Order. Failure to comply with this directive will res ult in dismissal of Shekeira as a plaintiff in this action. If Donald Williams would like to pursue this action he must, within thirty-five (35) days of the date of this order, either (1) pay his portion of the filing fee ($175); or (2) file a n ew motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by the required prison account statement. Failure to comply with this directive will result in dismissal of Donald as a plaintiff in this action. The Clerk shall also send a copy of this o rder to the Treasurer's Office at the prison facility in which Donald is incarcerated, in order to facilitate any request by the plaintiff for his certified prison account statement. The Clerk shall provide each plaintiff with an Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. The motion for appointment of counsel (#5) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Summonses shall not issue pending resolution of the filing fee and an initial screening of the complaint. (PSSA, 1)[Remark: copies of Memorandum and Order set to plaintiffs along with standard IFP forms; copy of Memorandum and Order sent to Treasurer's Office at SBCC]
April 7, 2014 78 Featured Case Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered. Plaintiffs' 69 motion for anextension of time is GRANTED. Plaintiffs shall serve defendant Vidal within 30 days, or by May 9, 2014. Defendant Vidal's 68 motion to dismiss for lack of service is DISMISSED without prejudice to its renewal. (Cicolini, Pietro)
April 8, 2014 79 Featured Case Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: Amended MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered on defendant Vidal's 68 motion to dismiss and plaintiffs' 69 motion for an extension of time. Plaintiffs shall serve defendant Vidal within 31 days, or by May 9, 2014.(Cicolini, Pietro)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Williams et al v. Spencer et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shekeira Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis S. Spencer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Amblo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Gelb
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Osvaldo Vidal
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lesley Pierre
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian McDonald
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]