SANCHEZ LONDONO v. GONZALEZ

Petitioner: FRANCELLY SANCHEZ LONDONO
Respondent: NELSON GONZALEZ
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv11106
Filed: May 3, 2013
 
Court: Massachusetts District Court
Office: Boston Office
County: Barnstable
Presiding Judge: F. Dennis Saylor
 
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Injunction
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 31, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered. This case is stayed until June 14, 2013. (Written order attached)(Cicolini, Pietro)
November 18, 2013 72 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW entered. The petition is DENIED.(Cicolini, Pietro)
May 8, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered. Petitioners 3 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED without prejudice, and petitioners 2 Emergency Motion is GRANTED in part. A temporary restraining order will issue sep arately. The Court defers ruling on the remaining issues raised by petitioners Emergency Motion at this time. Petitioner shall, within21 days, either (1) pay the $400 filing and administrative fees or (2) file a renewed application to proceed in forma pauperis. It is further ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue summons for service of the Emergency Petition on respondent Nelson Gonzalez. The Clerk shall send the summons and this order to petitioners counsel, who must thereafter arrange for service of theEmergency Petition, Emergency Motion and this Order on respondent Nelson Gonzalez in accordance with Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Written order attached)(Cicolini, Pietro)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: SANCHEZ LONDONO v. GONZALEZ
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: FRANCELLY SANCHEZ LONDONO
Represented By: Peter J. Duffy(Designation Retained)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: NELSON GONZALEZ
Represented By: Mary Alys Azzarito(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Stephen J. Cullen(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Kelly A. Powers(Designation Retained)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]