CrossFit, Inc. v. Mustapha et al

Defendant: Chelmsford Sports Club and Donny Mustapha
Plaintiff: CrossFit, Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv11498
Filed: June 21, 2013
 
Court: Massachusetts District Court
Office: Boston Office
County: Suffolk
Presiding Judge: F. Dennis Saylor
 
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 10, 2014 102 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered. Plaintiff's 68 motion to dismiss the counterclaim as to the claims against it is GRANTED. Plaintiff's 56 motion to strike is DENIED as moot. (See attached memorandum and order for details and orders)(Cicolini, Pietro)
April 25, 2014 122 Opinion or Order of the Court Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ORDER entered # 32 Motion for Contempt is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; # 80 Motion to Compel is ALLOWED IN PART and DENIED IN PART; # 88 Motion for Modification IS TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT; # 110 Motion to Compel is ALLOWED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. (Quinn, Thomas)
July 10, 2014 145 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered. The 133 motion of third-party defendant Ronnie Briere for judgment on the pleadings is GRANTED. The 143 motion of defendant Donald Mustapha to amend is DENIED. The claims by Mustapha against Briere, and the claims by Briere against Mustapha, are DISMISSED without prejudice. (Cicolini, Pietro)
October 18, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered. Plaintiff's 23 Motion to Strike is GRANTED. (Cicolini, Pietro)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: CrossFit, Inc. v. Mustapha et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chelmsford Sports Club
Represented By: Daniel G. Booth
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donny Mustapha
Represented By: Daniel G. Booth
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CrossFit, Inc.
Represented By: Victor H. Polk, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]