Sarnacki v. Golden et al

Defendant: Kenneth W Chandler, John B Furman, I Marie Wadecki, Jeffrey D Buchanan, Robert L Scott, Mitchell A Saltz, Colton R Melby, Ann B Makkiya, Leland A Nichols, Thomas L Taylor, Smith & Wesson Holding Corporation, Michael F Golden, John A Kelly and Barry M Monheit
Plaintiff: Aaron Sarnacki
 
Case Number: 3:2011cv30009
Filed: January 14, 2011
 
Court: Massachusetts District Court
Office: Springfield Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Michael A. Ponsor
 
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 15, 2013 104 Featured Case Judge Michael A. Ponsor: ENDORSED ORDER entered granting 93 Motion to Quash Plaintiff's Notice of Subpoena to Special Litigation Counsel and for Protective Order. ALLOWED. Plaintiffs have offered no compelling reason to justify a deposition of special litigation counsel. Their arguments exaggerate the importance of this potential testimony on the relatively narrow issue before the court. So ordered. (Lindsay, Maurice)
March 12, 2014 144 Featured Case Judge Michael A. Ponsor: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered. As follows: For the reasons stated. Defendants Motion for Summary Dismissal of [the] Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint (Dkt. No. 111 ) is hereby ALLOWED. The clerkwill enter judgment for Defendants. The case may now be closed. It is So Ordered. See the attached memo and order for complete details. (Lindsay, Maurice)
March 12, 2014 145 Featured Case Judge Michael A. Ponsor: ORDER entered. JUDGMENT for defendants. (Lindsay, Maurice)
March 29, 2012 38 Featured Case Judge Michael A. Ponsor: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered. As follows: Defendants motion to dismiss (Dkt. No. 29 ) is DENIED without prejudice. A renewed motion to dismiss may be filed on or before July 31, 2012 and opposed by August 31, 2012. The court will thereafter either set the motion for hearing or rule on thepapers. See the attached memo and order for complete details. (Lindsay, Maurice)
January 15, 2013 80 Featured Case Judge Michael A. Ponsor: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered. As follows: The Motion to Compel Responses to Interrogatories (Dkt. No. 49 ) and the Motion to Compel Production of Documents (Dkt. No. 52 ) are hereby DENIED, except that Defendants will produ ce, within fourteen days of this ruling, copies of any so-called tolling agreements entered into in connection with earlier related litigation. The Motion for Revised Scheduling Order (Dkt. No. 60 ) is hereby ALLOWED. Depositions relating to the issue identified in the courts March 29, 2012 memorandum (Dkt. No. 38 ) will be completed by April 19, 2013. See the attached memo and order for complete details. (Lindsay, Maurice)
May 6, 2013 98 Featured Case Judge Michael A. Ponsor: ORDER entered. ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION to set Briefing Schedule. See attached schedule for details. (Lindsay, Maurice)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Sarnacki v. Golden et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth W Chandler
Represented By: Francis D. Dibble, Jr.
Represented By: Jennifer M Foster
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Poindexter
Represented By: Brian Jay Schulman
Represented By: John A. Sten
Represented By: E Jeffrey Walsh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John B Furman
Represented By: Francis D. Dibble, Jr.
Represented By: Jennifer M Foster
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Poindexter
Represented By: Brian Jay Schulman
Represented By: John A. Sten
Represented By: E Jeffrey Walsh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I Marie Wadecki
Represented By: Francis D. Dibble, Jr.
Represented By: Jennifer M Foster
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Poindexter
Represented By: Brian Jay Schulman
Represented By: John A. Sten
Represented By: E Jeffrey Walsh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey D Buchanan
Represented By: Francis D. Dibble, Jr.
Represented By: Jennifer M Foster
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Poindexter
Represented By: Brian Jay Schulman
Represented By: John A. Sten
Represented By: E Jeffrey Walsh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L Scott
Represented By: Francis D. Dibble, Jr.
Represented By: Jennifer M Foster
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Poindexter
Represented By: Brian Jay Schulman
Represented By: John A. Sten
Represented By: E Jeffrey Walsh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell A Saltz
Represented By: Francis D. Dibble, Jr.
Represented By: Jennifer M Foster
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Poindexter
Represented By: Brian Jay Schulman
Represented By: John A. Sten
Represented By: E Jeffrey Walsh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colton R Melby
Represented By: Francis D. Dibble, Jr.
Represented By: Jennifer M Foster
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Poindexter
Represented By: Brian Jay Schulman
Represented By: John A. Sten
Represented By: E Jeffrey Walsh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann B Makkiya
Represented By: Francis D. Dibble, Jr.
Represented By: Jennifer M Foster
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Poindexter
Represented By: Brian Jay Schulman
Represented By: John A. Sten
Represented By: E Jeffrey Walsh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leland A Nichols
Represented By: Francis D. Dibble, Jr.
Represented By: Jennifer M Foster
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Poindexter
Represented By: Brian Jay Schulman
Represented By: John A. Sten
Represented By: E Jeffrey Walsh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas L Taylor
Represented By: Francis D. Dibble, Jr.
Represented By: Jennifer M Foster
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Poindexter
Represented By: Brian Jay Schulman
Represented By: John A. Sten
Represented By: E Jeffrey Walsh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith & Wesson Holding Corporation
Represented By: Francis D. Dibble, Jr.
Represented By: Jennifer M Foster
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Poindexter
Represented By: Brian Jay Schulman
Represented By: John A. Sten
Represented By: E Jeffrey Walsh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael F Golden
Represented By: E Jeffrey Walsh
Represented By: John A. Sten
Represented By: Brian Jay Schulman
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Poindexter
Represented By: Jennifer M Foster
Represented By: Francis D. Dibble, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John A Kelly
Represented By: E Jeffrey Walsh
Represented By: John A. Sten
Represented By: Brian Jay Schulman
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Poindexter
Represented By: Jennifer M Foster
Represented By: Francis D. Dibble, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry M Monheit
Represented By: Francis D. Dibble, Jr.
Represented By: Jennifer M Foster
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Poindexter
Represented By: Brian Jay Schulman
Represented By: John A. Sten
Represented By: E Jeffrey Walsh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Sarnacki
Represented By: Craig W Smith
Represented By: Gerald Barrett
Represented By: Terence K. Ankner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]