Margaret Wagner v. Baystate Health Inc

Plaintiff: Margaret Wagner
Defendant: Baystate Health Inc
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv30146
Filed: August 13, 2012
 
Court: Massachusetts District Court
Office: Springfield Office
County: Hampden
Referring Judge: Kenneth P. Neiman
Presiding Judge: Michael A. Ponsor
 
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 20, 2014 111 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Michael A. Ponsor: ORDER entered. ORDER PROHIBITING POST-VERDICT CONTACT WITH JURORS. See the attached order for details. (Lindsay, Maurice)
March 13, 2014 131 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Michael A. Ponsor: ENDORSED ORDER entered granting in part Dft's 115 Motion for Taxation of Costs. ALLOWED, in part. The costs for the Garvin and Blaney depositions ($50.35 and $349.35) have been deducted since they were never used and the subpoena costs for Moccio (91.49) have also been deducted, since she was never called. Total costs of $4054.76 are hereby awarded. So ordered. (Lindsay, Maurice)
October 29, 2013 80 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Michael A. Ponsor: ENDORSED ORDER entered denying 61 Motion to Strike Affidavit of Joanne Palmer. DENIED as unnecessary. In ruling on the motion for summary judgment the court did not consider the disputed portion of the Palmer affidavit. So ordered. (Lindsay, Maurice)
October 29, 2013 81 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Michael A. Ponsor: ENDORSED ORDER entered denying 69 Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Response to Dft's Statement. DENIED as moot. The court has allowed Defendants motion. So ordered. (Lindsay, Maurice)
October 29, 2013 82 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Michael A. Ponsor: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered. As follows: For the reasons stated in the attached memorandum and order, Defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Dkt. No. 57 ) is hereby ALLOWED. The court will retain supplemental jurisdiction over the remaining state-law claims. The clerk will now schedule the case for a final pretrial conference on those remaining issues. It is So Ordered. See the attached memo and order for complete details. (Lindsay, Maurice)
February 4, 2014 99 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Michael A. Ponsor: ENDORSED ORDER entered granting 89 Motion to Amend its Trial Exhibit List. ALLOWED, with the understanding that references on the tax returns solely to Plaintiff's husbands earnings may be redacted. So ordered. (Lindsay, Maurice)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Margaret Wagner v. Baystate Health Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Wagner
Represented By: Tani E. Sapirstein
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baystate Health Inc
Represented By: Jasmin M. Rojas
Represented By: Marylou Fabbo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]