In Re: Eresian v. Mantalvanos, et al

Appellant: Ara Eresian, Jr.
Appellee: Richard King, David W. Ostrander and William N. Mantalvanos
Debtor: William N. Mantalvanos
Case Number: 3:2012cv30223
Filed: December 20, 2012
Court: Massachusetts District Court
Office: Springfield Office
County: Hampden
Presiding Judge: George A. OToole
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334 Bankruptcy Appeal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 11, 2015 35 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. The Court's civil contempt order of February 5, 2015, is amended as set forth in this Order. Appellee's motion for an order of civil contempt is granted. Appellant's motion to vacate the finding of civil contempt is denied. The order of February 19, 2015, staying the February 5, 2015 order of contempt and the execution of the accompanying arrest warrant is vacated. The arrest warrant as to Ara Eresian, Jr, issu ed on February 6, 2015, shall be in full force and effect. He shall be incarcerated (1) for a term of 90 days or (2) until he complies with this Courts orders of September 20, 2013, and February 10, 2014, or makes satisfactory arrangements to do so as approved by the Court, whichever period is shorter.(FDS, law3)
March 17, 2015 44 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered granting 41 Motion for Bond (Attachments: # 1 Order(Woodlock, J.)) (Pezzarossi, Lisa)
September 20, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge George A. OToole, Jr: ELECTRONIC OPINION AND ORDER entered granting 5 Motion to Dismiss (Danieli, Chris)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Eresian v. Mantalvanos, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Ara Eresian, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Richard King
Represented By: Richard T. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: David W. Ostrander
Represented By: Elizabeth D. Katz
Represented By: David W. Ostrander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: William N. Mantalvanos
Represented By: Tom G. Vukmirovits
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: William N. Mantalvanos
Represented By: Tom G. Vukmirovits
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]