Aviles v. Dickhaut

Defendant: Thomas Dickhaut
Plaintiff: Angel Aviles
Case Number: 4:2012cv40017
Filed: February 8, 2012
Court: Massachusetts District Court
Office: Worcester Office
County: Worcester
Presiding Judge: F. Dennis Saylor
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 22, 2012 16 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered denying 2 Motion to Stay. Inlight of his pro se status, petitioner will be given additional time to dismiss his unexhausted claims. The petition for a writ of habeas corpus will be dismissed without prejudice unless, within 21 days of the date of this Order, petitioner files a request to dismiss the unexhausted claims in his petition and proceed on the merits of the exhausted claims. (Castles, Martin)
April 10, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered. Respondents 25 motion to dismiss the petition will be granted unless, within 30 days of the date of this order, petitioner files a request to dismiss the unexhausted claims in his 1 petition and proceed on the merits of the exhausted claims.(Cicolini, Pietro)
May 15, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered granting 25 Motion to Dismiss. (Cicolini, Pietro)
May 16, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered. ORDER VACATING DISMISSAL. 30 Motion to dismiss "exhausted issues" is GRANTED.(Cicolini, Pietro) Modified on 5/16/2013 to add ruling on motion (Cicolini, Pietro).
July 10, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered. The 1 petition for a writ of habeas corpus is DENIED.(Cicolini, Pietro)
February 9, 2012 4 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: PROCEDURAL ORDER entered: if petitioner wishes to proceed with this action, within 21 days of the date of this Procedural Order, he either must (1) pay the $5.00 filing fee; or (2) file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by a certified prison account statement. (PSSA, 1)[Remark: IFP form sent with copy of Procedural Order].

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aviles v. Dickhaut
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Dickhaut
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Aviles
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]