Markel American Insurance Company v. Olsen

Plaintiff: Markel American Insurance Company
Defendant: Lorn H Olsen
 
Case Number: 2:2010cv11667
Filed: April 23, 2010
 
Court: Michigan Eastern District Court
Office: Detroit Office
County: Oakland
Presiding Judge: Lawrence P Zatkoff
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 25, 2011 22 Featured Case ORDER denying 17 Motion for Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (MLan)
March 29, 2012 47 Featured Case ORDER denying 26 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 30 Motion to Strike; denying 31 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Lawrence P. Zatkoff. (MVer)
August 13, 2012 50 Featured Case ORDER granting 48 Motion to Strike. Signed by District Judge Lawrence P. Zatkoff. (MVer)
March 27, 2013 56 Featured Case ORDER denying 51 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by District Judge Lawrence P. Zatkoff. (MVer)
May 30, 2013 63 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER re Bench Trial. Signed by District Judge Lawrence P. Zatkoff. (MVer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Markel American Insurance Company v. Olsen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Markel American Insurance Company
Represented By: Gregory I. Thomas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorn H Olsen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]