Montgomery v. CitiMortgage, Inc. et al

Defendant: CitiMortgage, Inc., Mac Freddie, ABN AMRO Mortgage Group, Inc., Evergreen Woods Condominium Association, Kramer-Triad Management Group, LLC, GTJ Consulting, LLC, Kellum Michael E., Ross Towing And Used Auto Parts, 24261 Evergreen Road, Southfield, MI and 6576 Stonebridge E, West Bloomfield, MI
Plaintiff: Montgomery D.
 
Case Number: 2:2010cv11729
Filed: April 28, 2010
 
Court: Michigan Eastern District Court
Office: Detroit Office
County: Oakland
Presiding Judge: Julian Abele Cook
 
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 8, 2012 110 Featured Case ORDER denying 84 Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Transcript. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Randon. (Miles, M)
December 5, 2012 117 Featured Case ORDER Adopting Report and Recommendation for 75 Motion for Judgment filed by GTJ Consulting, LLC, 72 Motion to Dismiss filed by Freddie Mac, 103 Motion to Strike filed by D Montgomery, 71 Motion to Strike filed by CitiMortgage, In c., Freddie Mac, 113 Report and Recommendation, 104 Motion for Order filed by D Montgomery, 73 Motion to Dismiss filed by CitiMortgage, Inc. Defendants Freddie Mac, GTJ Consulting, LLC, ABN AMRO Mortgage Group, Inc. and CitiMortgage, Inc. terminated. Signed by District Judge Julian Abele Cook. (KDoa)
June 28, 2010 17 Featured Case ORDER granting 13 Motion to Set Aside ; denying 15 Motion for Judgment; granting 16 Motion to Expedite. Signed by District Judge Julian Abele Cook. (KDoa)
March 8, 2011 47 Featured Case ORDER denying 43 Motion to Stay; granting 44 Motion to Expedite. Signed by District Judge Julian Abele Cook. (KDoa)
October 27, 2011 50 Featured Case ORDER granting 28 Motion to Intervene; granting 42 Motion to Dismiss; denying 46 Motion to Extend ; denying 22 Motion for Sanctions; denying 23 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 27 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by District Judge Julian Abele Cook. (KDoa)
January 25, 2012 57 Featured Case ORDER granting 53 Motion To Take Video Depositions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Randon. (Miles, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Montgomery v. CitiMortgage, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CitiMortgage, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mac Freddie
Represented By: Rana D. Razzaque
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABN AMRO Mortgage Group, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evergreen Woods Condominium Association
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kramer-Triad Management Group, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GTJ Consulting, LLC
Represented By: Rana D. Razzaque
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kellum Michael E.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ross Towing And Used Auto Parts
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 24261 Evergreen Road, Southfield, MI
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 6576 Stonebridge E, West Bloomfield, MI
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Montgomery D.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]