United States of America v. 16,374.42 Square Feet of Land, More or Less, Situate in St. Clair County, State of Michigan et al

Defendant: 16,374.42 Square Feet of Land, More or Less, Situate in St. Clair County, State of Michigan, State of Michigan, LaSalle Bank Midwest, N.A. and Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Inc.
Plaintiff: United States of America
Claimant: Elenor Wnuk, Thomas E Benigni, Rosemarie Benigni, Robert D Chase, Donna J Chase, Charles A Vassallo, Lola Vassallo, Gary L Mondello, Sandra L Mondello and Milton Anthony Garvonic
 
Case Number: 2:2010cv14619
Filed: November 19, 2010
 
Court: Michigan Eastern District Court
Office: Detroit Office
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Duggan
Referring Judge: Mona K Majzoub
 
Nature of Suit: Land Condemnation
Cause of Action: 43:945
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 10, 2011 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 25 Application, filed by Charles A Vassallo, Charles Strittmatter, Christopher S Gardner, Milton Anthony Garvonic, Gary L Mondello, Donna J Chase, Carolyn Todd, Rosemarie Benigni, Elenor Wnuk, Michelle Gardner, Thomas E Benigni, Sandra L Mondello, Robert D Chase, Lola Vassallo, Yong Strittmatter Signed by District Judge Patrick J. Duggan. (MOre)
August 2, 2011 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ESTABLISHING TRIAL DOCKET FOR SEPTEMBER/OCTOBER, 2011. Signed by District Judge Patrick J. Duggan. (MOre)
September 8, 2011 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR WITHDRAWAL OF CERTAIN ESTIMATED JUST COMPENSATION. Signed by District Judge Patrick J. Duggan. (MOre)
September 29, 2011 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ESTABLISHING TRIAL DOCKET FOR NOVEMBER/DECEMBER, 2011. Signed by District Judge Patrick J. Duggan. (MOre)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: United States of America v. 16,374.42 Square Feet of Land, More or Less, Situate in St. Clair County, State of Michigan et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 16,374.42 Square Feet of Land, More or Less, Situate in St. Clair County, State of Michigan
Represented By: Boris K. Yakima
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Michigan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LaSalle Bank Midwest, N.A.
Represented By: John A. Behrendt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Inc.
Represented By: John A. Behrendt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Ellen E. Christensen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Elenor Wnuk
Represented By: Boris K. Yakima
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Thomas E Benigni
Represented By: Boris K. Yakima
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Rosemarie Benigni
Represented By: Boris K. Yakima
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Robert D Chase
Represented By: Boris K. Yakima
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Donna J Chase
Represented By: Boris K. Yakima
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Charles A Vassallo
Represented By: Boris K. Yakima
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Lola Vassallo
Represented By: Boris K. Yakima
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Gary L Mondello
Represented By: Boris K. Yakima
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Sandra L Mondello
Represented By: Boris K. Yakima
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Milton Anthony Garvonic
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]