Weirton Association v. Woodward Detroit CVS, LLC

Defendant: Woodward Detroit CVS, LLC
Plaintiff: Weirton Association
 
Case Number: 2:2011cv14956
Filed: November 9, 2011
 
Court: Michigan Eastern District Court
Office: Detroit Office
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Robert H. Cleland
Referring Judge: Mark A. Randon
 
Nature of Suit: Rent, Lease, and Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 13, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Telephone Conference., ( Telephone Conference set for 3/15/2012 10:00 AM before District Judge Robert H. Cleland) Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
November 2, 2012 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 Defendant's Motion to Compel. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
December 12, 2012 31 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER for Order for Attorney Fees re: 27 Motion for Costs. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Weirton Association v. Woodward Detroit CVS, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woodward Detroit CVS, LLC
Represented By: Elaine A. Parson
Represented By: George S. Fish
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Weirton Association
Represented By: Phillip E. Seltzer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]