Lanier v. Spectrum Human Services

Defendant: Spectrum Human Services
Plaintiff: Latricia Lanier
Case Number: 2:2012cv11901
Filed: April 27, 2012
Court: Michigan Eastern District Court
Office: Detroit Office
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Patrick J. Duggan
Referring Judge: Mark A. Randon
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 6, 2012 13 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting 9 Motion to Set Aside. Signed by District Judge Patrick J. Duggan. (MOre)
September 11, 2012 20 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying 17 Motion to Strike. Signed by District Judge Patrick J. Duggan. (MOre)
October 15, 2012 24 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting 15 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Patrick J. Duggan. (MOre)
October 8, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYINGre 34 Complaint filed by Latricia Lanier, 32 Docket Annotation, 33 Docket Annotation. Signed by District Judge Patrick J. Duggan. (MOre)
May 1, 2012 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT WITHIN 21 DAYS re 1 Complaint filed by Latricia Lanier. Signed by District Judge Patrick J. Duggan. (MOre)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lanier v. Spectrum Human Services
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spectrum Human Services
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latricia Lanier
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]