Vamplew v. Wayne State University Board of Governors et al

Defendant: Felicia Grace, Katherine Zimnicki, David J. Strauss, Cynthia Redwine, Mary Zugcic, Wayne State University Board of Governors and Barbara K Redman
Plaintiff: Brad Vamplew
Case Number: 2:2012cv14561
Filed: October 15, 2012
Court: Michigan Eastern District Court
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Avern Cohn
Referring Judge: Mark A. Randon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 13, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Regarding 16 Motion to Quash Subpoena Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (SCha)
June 20, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court Memorandum and Order Granting Non-Party Detroit Medical Center's 28 Motion to Quash Subpoenas. Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (SCha)
July 9, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Denying Plaintiff's 39 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (SCha)
August 13, 2013 46 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Denying 16 Motion to Quash Subpoena. Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (SCha)
September 5, 2013 50 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Denying Non-Party Detroit Medical Center's 45 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (SCha)
January 24, 2014 61 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM & ORDER granting in part and denying in part 55 Motion to Compel.Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (CBet)
October 28, 2014 91 Opinion or Order of the Court Memorandum and Order Denying Plaintiff's 85 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (SCha)
December 2, 2014 99 Opinion or Order of the Court Memorandum and Order Granting Plaintiff's 95 Motion to Deny Defendants' Bill of Costs and Denying Defendants' Bill of Costs. Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (SCha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vamplew v. Wayne State University Board of Governors et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Felicia Grace
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine Zimnicki
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David J. Strauss
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Redwine
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Zugcic
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne State University Board of Governors
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara K Redman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brad Vamplew
Represented By: Anthony Della Pelle
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]