Atwater et al v. Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association

Defendant: Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association
Plaintiff: Charles Atwater and Jodette Atwater
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv15332
Filed: December 5, 2012
 
Court: Michigan Eastern District Court
County: Oakland
Presiding Judge: Mark A. Goldsmith
Referring Judge: David R. Grand
 
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 13, 2012 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Requiring Plaintiffs to File a Second Amended Complaint, (Responses due by 12/18/2012). Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Goltz, D)
July 8, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Goltz, D)
August 21, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Plaintiffs' 23 Motion for Reconsideration re 23 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Goltz, D)
December 5, 2012 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Requiring Plaintiffs to File an Amended Complaint, (Responses due by 12/12/2012). Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Goltz, D)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Atwater et al v. Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Atwater
Represented By: Angela K. Howell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jodette Atwater
Represented By: Angela K. Howell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]