Dibbern v. University of Michigan et al

Plaintiff: Jennifer Dibbern
Defendant: University of Michigan, The Board of Regents of the University of Michigan, Mary Sue Coleman, Rachel Goldman and Tresa Pollock
Case Number: 2:2012cv15632
Filed: December 21, 2012
Court: Michigan Eastern District Court
County: Washtenaw
Presiding Judge: Sean F. Cox
Referring Judge: Paul J. Komives
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 1, 2015 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Overruling 81 Plaintiff's Objections to Magistrate Judge's Order, filed by Jennifer Dibbern. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
April 22, 2015 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OVERRULING 99 Objection to 97 Order on Motion to Compel by All Defendants. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
May 17, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Tresa Pollock, Rachel Goldman, Peter Green, Mary Sue Coleman, University of Michigan, The Board of Regents of the University of Michigan. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
November 18, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting 32 Motion to Extend; denying 25 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
September 24, 2014 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 45 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul J. Komives. (MWil)
October 3, 2014 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part Defendants' 48 Motion to Compel to Privilege Log Documents--Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul J. Komives. (MWil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dibbern v. University of Michigan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Dibbern
Represented By: David M. Blanchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Michigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Board of Regents of the University of Michigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Sue Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachel Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tresa Pollock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.