Franklin v. Eelnurme et al

Defendant: Kelley Eelnurme, Doreen Mcinnes and Davita World Headquarters
Plaintiff: Merissa Franklin
Case Number: 2:2013cv11329
Filed: March 26, 2013
Court: Michigan Eastern District Court
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Nancy G. Edmunds
Referring Judge: Mark A. Randon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 22, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Accepting and Adopting the Magistrate Judge's April 19, 2013 8 Report and Recommendation. Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (JOwe)
July 11, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER and OPINION Accepting and Adopting 14 Report and Recommendation granting 5 Motion to Dismiss filed by Doreen Mcinnes, Kelley Eelnurme, Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (JCur)
October 11, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER Accepting and Adopting the Magistrate Judge's September 11, 2013 Report and Recommendation 26 and Granting Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment 23 . Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (JCur)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Franklin v. Eelnurme et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelley Eelnurme
Represented By: Shannon V. Loverich
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doreen Mcinnes
Represented By: Shannon V. Loverich
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davita World Headquarters
Represented By: Shannon V. Loverich
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merissa Franklin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]