McKinney v. Corizon Health, Inc. et al

Defendant: Michigan Department of Corrections, Corizon Health, Inc., Heidi Washinton, Erin Orleberke and John T Steele
Plaintiff: Tyra S McKinney
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv11456
Filed: March 29, 2013
 
Court: Michigan Eastern District Court
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Gerald E. Rosen
Referring Judge: R. Steven Whalen
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 2, 2013 26 Featured Case ORDER denying Plaintiff's 25 Motion to Compel. Signed by District Judge Gerald E. Rosen. (JOwe) . Modified on 10/2/2013 (JOwe).
December 3, 2013 34 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part, and taken Under Advisement in Part 28 Motion to Compel; granting in part and Taken Under Advisement in Part 32 Motion to Compel, Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (MWil)
March 13, 2014 54 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant's 42 Motion to Dismiss, Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (MWil)
March 27, 2014 59 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 47 Motion to Compel, Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (MWil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: McKinney v. Corizon Health, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michigan Department of Corrections
Represented By: Brittany A. Campbell
Represented By: Christina M. Grossi
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon Health, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heidi Washinton
Represented By: Brittany A. Campbell
Represented By: Christina M. Grossi
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erin Orleberke
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John T Steele
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyra S McKinney
Represented By: Benjamin Whitfield, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]