Hill v. United States of America

Defendant: United States of America
Plaintiff: Douglas Hill
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv11713
Filed: April 16, 2013
 
Court: Michigan Eastern District Court
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Robert H. Cleland
Referring Judge: Michael J. Hluchaniuk
 
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 16, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (Monda, H)
October 3, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Requiring Clarification ( Responses due by 10/4/2013) Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
October 8, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Stipulation to Stay Case and adjourn deadlines for 30 days Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
October 22, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Reinstating Prior Discovery Deadlines. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
June 18, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting 22 Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
July 2, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying 29 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Hill v. United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Hill
Represented By: Cyril V. Weiner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]