Neroni et al v. Bank of America et al

Plaintiff: Allison Neroni and Randy Neroni
Defendant: Bank of America and Trott and Trott P.C.
Case Number: 2:2013cv11823
Filed: April 23, 2013
Court: Michigan Eastern District Court
County: Macomb
Referring Judge: David R. Grand
Presiding Judge: Lawrence P. Zatkoff
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 17, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding as moot 3 Motion to Dismiss; granting 8 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Lawrence P. Zatkoff. (MVer)
December 4, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 19 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Lawrence P. Zatkoff. (MVer)
April 24, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 21 Motion to Extend ; granting 22 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Lawrence P. Zatkoff. (MVer)
October 14, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 30 Motion to Void Order. Signed by District Judge Lawrence P. Zatkoff. (MVer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neroni et al v. Bank of America et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allison Neroni
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Neroni
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America
Represented By: Dawn T. Yeaton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trott and Trott P.C.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]