Moore v. Warren et al

Plaintiff: Shalecsha Moore
Defendant: Millicent Warren, Jodi DeAngelo, Pei, Ozor and Subrina Aikens
Case Number: 2:2013cv11831
Filed: April 23, 2013
Court: Michigan Eastern District Court
County: Washtenaw
Presiding Judge: Patrick J. Duggan
Referring Judge: David R. Grand
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 24, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 8 Motion for Summary Judgment; adopting 21 Report and Recommendation. Signed by District Judge Patrick J. Duggan. (MOre)
April 15, 2014 48 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying 25 Motion For Class Certification; adopting 43 Report and Recommendation. Signed by District Judge Patrick J. Duggan. (MOre)
February 22, 2015 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting 73 Report and Recommendation, GRANTING 56 Motion to Dismiss, Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Jodi DeAngelo, GRANTING 52 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Pei, Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
July 1, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO PROVIDE CORRECT ADDRESS FOR DEFENDANT PEI. Signed by District Judge Patrick J. Duggan. (MOre)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Warren et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shalecsha Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Millicent Warren
Represented By: Kevin R. Himebaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jodi DeAngelo
Represented By: Kevin R. Himebaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ozor
Represented By: Kevin R. Himebaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Subrina Aikens
Represented By: Kevin R. Himebaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.