El-Hallani et al v. Huntington National Bank

Defendant: Huntington National Bank
Plaintiff: Mark Manuaeel and Ali El-Hallani
Case Number: 2:2013cv12983
Filed: July 11, 2013
Court: Michigan Eastern District Court
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Gerald E. Rosen
Referring Judge: David R. Grand
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 2, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION and ORDER Denying Plaintifs' 6 Motion to Certify Class Without Prejudice. Signed by District Judge Gerald E. Rosen. (JOwe)
March 13, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION and ORDER granting Defendant's 14 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Gerald E. Rosen. (JOwe)
May 29, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION and ORDER granting Defendant's 27 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Gerald E. Rosen. (JOwe)
August 12, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S 33 MOTION TO REOPEN CASE AND FOR SANCTIONS UNDER RULE 11 Signed by District Judge Gerald E. Rosen. (JOwe)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: El-Hallani et al v. Huntington National Bank
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntington National Bank
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Manuaeel
Represented By: Nabih H. Ayad
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ali El-Hallani
Represented By: Nabih H. Ayad
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]