Alongi et al v. Bombardier Recreational Products, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Shari Alongi, Anthony Alongi and Charles Alongi
Defendant: Bombardier Recreational Products, Inc., BRP US Inc. and Chartier Holdings, Inc.
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv13374
Filed: July 31, 2012
 
Court: Michigan Eastern District Court
Office: Detroit Office
County: St. Clair
Presiding Judge: Robert H. Cleland
Referring Judge: R. Steven Whalen
 
Nature of Suit: Marine Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 14, 2012 21 Featured Case ORDER setting telephone conference., ( Telephone Conference set for 11/1/2012 11:00 AM before District Judge Robert H. Cleland) Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
February 27, 2013 33 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 23 Chartier Holdings, Inc's Motion for Summary Judgment; GRANTING 25 Defendant Bombardier Recreational Products Inc.s' and BRP US, Inc's Motion for Summary Judgment; Plaintiffs'Supplemental Brief due by 3/20/2013, Chartier's Responsive Supplemental Brief due by 4/3/2013, Plaintiffs'Optional Reply by 4/10/2013 (see order for details). Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
April 16, 2013 35 Featured Case JUDGMENT in favor of defendants Bombardier Recreational Products, Inc and BRP-US, Inc against Plantiffs Charles Alongi, Shari Alongi and Anthony Alongi (LWag)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Alongi et al v. Bombardier Recreational Products, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shari Alongi
Represented By: Raechel M. Badalamenti
Represented By: Robert S. Huth, Jr.
Represented By: Patrick S. McKay
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Alongi
Represented By: Raechel M. Badalamenti
Represented By: Robert S. Huth, Jr.
Represented By: Patrick S. McKay
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Alongi
Represented By: Patrick S. McKay
Represented By: Robert S. Huth, Jr.
Represented By: Raechel M. Badalamenti
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bombardier Recreational Products, Inc.
Represented By: Mark H. Verwys
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRP US Inc.
Represented By: Mark H. Verwys
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chartier Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Robert E. Packus, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]